Bajoua v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nagham Bajoua
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. and DOES 1 to 25
Case Number: 3:2020cv01458
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via Videoconference. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) and Case Management Conference (CMC) currently scheduled for October 20, 2020 are hereby RESET for November 3, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. As before, the Court will use its official Zoom video conferencing account to hold the ENE and CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/28/2020. (tcf)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CONTACT INFORMATION FOR ATTORNEY OF RECORD by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Vail, Tamara) (jpp).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Via Videoconference. IT IS ORDERED that a videoconference Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) of your case will be held on October 20, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, the Court will immediately thereafter hold a Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/7/2020. (tcf)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Vail, Tamara) (tcf).
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00018192-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14237153.), filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Tami Vail,, #3 Exhibits A-G (State Court Complaint))The new case number is 3:20-cv-1458-MMA-AHG. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bajoua v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Tamara Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagham Bajoua
Represented By: Steven Ray York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?