Silberberg v. Dauntless Discovery LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Silberberg
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10 and Dauntless Discovery LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01545
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 10/20/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/16/2020.(jpp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Zoom Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/16/2020, Zoom Case Management Conference held on 9/16/2020. Case did not settle. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorneys Timothy R. Pestotnik and Russell Winslow). (Defendant Attorneys Jihan Murad and Anthony Platt). (no document attached) (err)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference currently scheduled for September 16, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. are hereby RESET to September 16, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. All other guidelines and requirements remain in effect. See ECF No. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/15/2020. (err)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Dauntless Discovery LLC (Murad, Jihan) (jpp).
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF& COUNTER-DEFENDANT ANDREW SILBERBERGS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DAUNTLESS DISCOVERY LLCS COUNTERCLAIM and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Andrew Silberberg.(Pestotnik, Timothy) (jpp).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/16/2020 at 1:30pm. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/18/2020.(jpp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Andrew Silberberg by Dauntless Discovery LLC.(Murad, Jihan) (jpp).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dauntless Discovery LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (jmr) (jms).
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00021089-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14302705.), filed by Dauntless Discovery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jihan Murad (State Court Complaint), #3 Notice of Appearance of Counsel)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1545-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silberberg v. Dauntless Discovery LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauntless Discovery LLC
Represented By: Jihan Murad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Silberberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Pestotnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?