Grayton v. Carroll et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Grayton
Defendant: Does 1 thru 5, David A. Ortiz and Tiffany L. Carroll
Case Number: 3:2020cv01584
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331tt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying Motion for Reconsideration [Doc. No. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/9/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration by Maurice Grayton. (anh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that For the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The motion to proceed IFP [Doc. No. 2] is DENIED; 2. The complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend; 3. The Court certifies that an IFP appeal from this order would be frivolous and therefore would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); Case Closed. It is SO ORDERED.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (dsn)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Sua Sponte Dismissing Complaint [Doc. No. #2 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/19/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (dsn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maurice Grayton. (smd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tiffany L. Carroll, Does 1 thru 5, David A. Ortiz, IFP Filed, filed by Maurice Grayton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1584-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Grayton, Maurice)(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayton v. Carroll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Grayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 thru 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany L. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?