Candela v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dominic Candela
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2020cv01599
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): In light of the parties notice of settlement (ECF #7 ), all pending dates are vacated. On November 10, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., the parties must jointly call Judge Schopler's chambers to provide an oral status report as to filing the joint motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating that joint call to chambers. Should the joint motion to dismiss be filed before that time, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/23/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Litigation Deadlines by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hutson Smelley In Support of the Parties' Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Litigation Deadlines)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #5 ). The Court orders Defendant to respond to the complaint on or before 9/25/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/21/2020. (jdt)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, --- Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint -- (current deadline is 08/26/20, 30 day extension request to respond by 09/25/20) by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hutson Smelley in support of the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt).
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Orlando, Vivian) (jdt).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation for Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Orlando, Vivian). Modified on 8/19/2020 to add Corporate Parents Transamerica Corporation and AEGON N.V. to Transamerica Life Insurance Company(jdt).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, San Diego, case number 37-2020-00015617-CU-IC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14349082.), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc., Does 1-25. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 through 5)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1599-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(zda) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candela v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Vivian Ilana Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Candela
Represented By: David Andrew Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?