Shlomo Prizant et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Generation Trading Inc. and Shlomo Prizant
Defendant: Abbott & Abbott Law, Santiago Delgado, Jr., Todd Michael Abbott, Sion FL U.S. Inc., Howard Bruce Abbott, Does I-X and Roe Corporations I-X
Case Number: 3:2020cv01604
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
2 Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Third Joint Motion for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order and Continuance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Doc. No. #39 ). The preliminary injunction hearing is continued to 11/2/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. If the parties wish to file any supplemental documents in support or opposition of a preliminary injunction, the Plaintiffs may file by 10/26/20., and Defendants may file by 11/2/20 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/16/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
October 16, 2020 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Continue TRO and PI Hearing by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (McNamara, Thomas)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order and Continuance of Preliminary Injuction Hearing (Doc. No. #37 ) Motion to Continue. Preliminary injunction hearing is continued to 10/19/20 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. If the parties wish to file any supplemental documents in support or opposition of a preliminary injunction, the Plaintiffs may file by 10/12/20, and Defendant may file by 10/19/20 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/2/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
October 2, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Continue TRO and PI Hearing by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (McNamara, Thomas) (jmo).
September 30, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. Todd Michael Abbott served. (Gordon, Cornelia) (jmo).
September 30, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. Abbott & Abbott Law served. (Gordon, Cornelia) (jmo).
September 23, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. Sion FL U.S. Inc. served. (Gordon, Cornelia) (mme)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/4/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Joint Discovery Plan due 10/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 9/21/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND CONTINUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING (Doc. No. #29 ): The TRO entered on September 9, 2020 is extended and will remain in effect in all respects until the preliminary injunction hearing. The preliminary injunction hearing is continued to October 5, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. If the parties wish to file any supplemental documents in support or opposition of a preliminary injunction, the Plaintiffs may file by September 28, 2020, and Defendant may file by October 5, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/19/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(smy)
September 18, 2020 Filing 31 Defendant Howard Abbott's Answer filed by Howard Bruce Abbott. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/18/2020. (sxa)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Defendant Howard Abbotts Answer, from Defendant Howard Bruce Abbott. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/18/2020. (sxa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Continue TRO, PI Hearing by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (McNamara, Thomas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Santiago Delgado, Jr, Sion FL U.S. Inc..(Abbott, Todd)Attorney Todd Michael Abbott added to party Santiago Delgado, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Michael Abbott added to party Sion FL U.S. Inc.(pty:dft) (sxa).
September 15, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Todd Michael Abbott, Abbott & Abbott Law.(Abbott, Todd)Attorney Todd Michael Abbott added to party Todd Michael Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Michael Abbott added to party Abbott & Abbott Law(pty:dft) (sxa).
September 14, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. Santiago Delgado, Jr served. (Gordon, Cornelia) (sxa).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Against Defendant Howard Bruce Abbott, and Granting Expedited Discovery. If the parties wish to file any supplemental documents in support or opposition for a motion for preliminary injunction, the Plaintiffs may file by 9/14/2020, and Defendant may file an opposition by 9/21/2020 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/8/2020. (sxa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2020 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court will issue an order. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 9/21/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas W. McNamara; Cornelia Julianna Boleyn Gordon). (Defendant Attorney Todd M. Abbott, specially appearing). (Counsel for Transamerica: Steven D. Weinberg). (no document attached) (smy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Constructive Trust and Asset Freeze, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Todd Michael Abbott, Abbott & Abbott Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Abbott, Todd) (sxa).
September 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing (TIME CHANGE ONLY): Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the time set for the hearing on the motion for TRO is reset for 9/8/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (no document attached) (smy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #19 Supplemental Briefing (Redacted Decl.) by Plaintiffs Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (McNamara, Thomas) (sxa).
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant re #19 Supplemental Briefing filed by Shlomo Prizant, Generation Trading Inc. (ECF No. 19-2). (McNamara, Thomas) (sxa).
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiffs Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(McNamara, Thomas) (sxa).
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Constructive Trust and Asset Freeze, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Howard Bruce Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(Abbott, Todd) (sxa).
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Constructive Trust and Asset Freeze, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Howard Bruce Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(Abbott, Todd) (sxa).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER #5 Continuing Hearing on Temporary Restraining Order and Authorizing Service of Subpoena. The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is continued to 9/8/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Defendants may now file written opposition by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/27/2020. (sxa)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Information : The Court schedules a telephonic hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order for 8/31/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Defendants may file written opposition by 8/31/2020 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/24/2020.(sxa)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2020 re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Constructive Trust and Asset Freeze, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Shlomo Prizant, Generation Trading Inc. The Court continues the hearing to 8/31/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Court will issue an order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas W. McNamara; Cornelis Julianna Boleyn Gordon). (Defendant Attorney Todd Abbott, special appearance). (no document attached) (smy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Thomas W. McNamara Confirming Service on Howard Bruce Abbott by Plaintiffs Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (McNamara, Thomas) (sxa).
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Scheduling Order #11 ; August 21, 2020 email with instructions for August 24, 2020 telephonic hearing served on Howard Bruce Abbott on August 21, 2020, filed by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (Gordon, Cornelia) (sxa).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER : The Court Schedules a Telephonic hearing on this matter for 8/24/2020 11:15 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Defendant may submit an opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order by 8/24/2020 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/21/2020.(sxa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER OF Recusal. Judge M. James Lorenz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 20-cv-01604-H-LL.(no document attached)(zda)(zda)(jrd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1604-L-LL.(no document attached) (mme)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. Howard Bruce Abbott served. (McNamara, Thomas) (jpp).
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Constructive Trust and Asset Freeze, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue - Certification and Declaration of Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 65(b) and Civ.L.R. 83.3(g)(2) by Plaintiffs Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (McNamara, Thomas) (mme).
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Constructive Trust and Asset Freeze, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Shlomo Prizant, #3 Exhibit (s) 1-2 to Prizant Declaration, #4 Declaration of Alexander Burekhovich, #5 Exhibit (s) 1-4 to Burekhovich Declaration, #6 Declaration of Dan Whelan)(McNamara, Thomas) (mme).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cornelia Julianna Boleyn Gordon on behalf of Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant (Gordon, Cornelia)Attorney Cornelia Julianna Boleyn Gordon added to party Generation Trading Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Cornelia Julianna Boleyn Gordon added to party Shlomo Prizant(pty:pla) (mme).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Generation Trading Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement. No Parties With Financial Interest. (McNamara, Thomas) (mme).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Howard Bruce Abbott, Abbott & Abbott Law, Santiago Delgado, Jr, Does I-X, Roe Corporations I-X, Sion FL U.S. Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14352306.), filed by Generation Trading Inc., Shlomo Prizant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits 1 - 5)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1604-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (McNamara, Thomas)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shlomo Prizant et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generation Trading Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W McNamara
Represented By: Cornelia Julianna Boleyn Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shlomo Prizant
Represented By: Thomas W McNamara
Represented By: Cornelia Julianna Boleyn Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott & Abbott Law
Represented By: Todd Michael Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Delgado, Jr.
Represented By: Todd Michael Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Michael Abbott
Represented By: Todd Michael Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sion FL U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Todd Michael Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Bruce Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?