Blacher v. Diaz et al
Petitioner: Marlon Blacher
Respondent: Xavier Becerra and Ralph Diaz
Case Number: 3:2020cv01611
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Declining to Issue Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/6/2020. (USCA Case Number 20-55982. Order electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Marlon Blacher. The USDC has not issued or declined to issue a certificate of appealability in this appeal, which appears to arise under 28 U.S.C. 2254. This case is remanded to the USDC for the limited purpose of granting or denying a certificate of appealability at the court's earliest convenience. If the USDC issues a certificate of appealability, the court should specify which issue or issues meet the required showing. Under Asrar, if the USDC declines to issue a certificate, the court should state its reasons why a certificate of appealability should not be granted, and the Clerk of the USDC shall forward to the USCA the record with the order denying the certificate. (akr)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 USCA Case Number 20-55982 for #5 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Marlon Blacher. (akr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Marlon Blacher as to #4 Clerk's Judgment. Fee not paid. (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court denies Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismisses this action without prejudice to Petitioner's right to proceed with his claims in the proper venue of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf) (jms).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Dismissing Action without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/14/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf) (jms).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marlon Blacher. (jms)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Against Ralph Diaz, Xavier Becerra, filed by Marlon Blacher. ($5.00 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1611-MMA-AGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blacher v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marlon Blacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?