American Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Smuckers Foodservice, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: West American Insurance Company and American Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Smuckers Foodservice, Inc. and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2020cv01619
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. Case Management Conference held on 10/5/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/5/2020.(mme)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On October 5, 2020, the Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. The case did not settle. The Court will issue a scheduling order separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/05/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (AGS): Due to the Court's schedule, the October 5, 2020 Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to that same day at 11:00 a.m. The parties should use the same Zoom link already sent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/28/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Smuckers Foodservice, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kagan, Joseph)Attorney Joseph John Kagan added to party Smuckers Foodservice, Inc.(pty:dft) (mme).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Converting Early Neutral Evaluation to Zoom Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 9/2/2020.(mme)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/28/2020. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/30/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/26/2020.(mme)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Smuckers Foodservice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doody, Peter) (mme).
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Smuckers Foodservice, Inc.. Identifying Corporate Parent CP APN, Inc., Corporate Parent NU Pet Company, Corporate Parent J.M. Smucker Company for Smuckers Foodservice, Inc.. (smd) (sjt).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smuckers Foodservice, Inc.. (smd) (sjt).
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00015299-CU-PL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14366124.), filed by Smuckers Foodservice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint Included, #3 Declaration)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1619-BEN-AGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Smuckers Foodservice, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: Tom T. Nagashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Tom T. Nagashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smuckers Foodservice, Inc.
Represented By: Peter S Doody
Represented By: Joseph John Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?