Lofton v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Gene Lofton
Defendant: Hertz Vehicles, LLC, The Hertz Corporation, The United States of America, DOES 1 to 25 and Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01673
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2672 mv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 1/26/2021.(anh)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): On January 26, 2021, the Court held a continued Early Neutral Evaluation. The case did not settle. A scheduling order will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 1/26/2021. (no document attached) (mxa)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On December 22, 2020, the Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation. On January 26, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., the Court will hold a continued, Zoom-based ENE. The parties must submit updated briefing by January 19, 2021. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/22/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dorgan, Glen) (anh).
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dorgan, Glen)Attorney Glen Dorgan added to party The United States of America(pty:dft) (anh).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (AGS): The parties' motion to reinstate the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference (ECF #16 ) is granted. The Court will hold a Zoom-based ENE and CMC on December 22, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The Court will send a Zoom link to all counsel of record prior to the hearing. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE order (ECF #9 ) still apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/10/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION To Reinstate Early Neutral Evaluation and Related Dates by Gene Lofton. (De Santis, Thomas) (anh).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (AGS): In light of the settlement representations in defendant's status, the December 15, 2020 Early Neutral Evaluation and related dates are vacated. Instead, on January 5, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., the parties must jointly contact Judge Schopler's chambers to provide an oral status report on the filing of the settlement and dismissal motions. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating the joint call to chambers with counsel for all parties on the line. If a joint motion to dismiss is filed before that time, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/02/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Status by The Hertz Corporation (Dall, Terry) (anh).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (AGS): In light of the potential stay of some or all of this case, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to December 15, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The ENE statements and joint discovery plan are now due December 8, 2020. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE order (ECF #9 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/16/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Order: Court held a telephonic status conference on 10/13/2020 to address a stay of the litigation in whole or part due to Defendant Hertzs notice of bankruptcy [Doc. No. #8 ]. Parties are directed to confer and Plaintiff is instructed to file a joint statement by October 30, 2020 setting forth the position of the parties as to what aspects of the litigation, if any, can proceed during the pendency of the bankruptcy proceeding. It is SO ORDERED.(anh)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene Lofton. The United States of America served. (De Santis, Thomas) (anh).
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Order: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic off-the-record status conference is set for October 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the impact of Defendant Hertz Corporations notice of bankruptcy stay on this case. The dial in number is (888) 398-2342, and the access code is 1749358. It is SO ORDERED.(anh)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/1/2020.(anh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by The Hertz Corporation (Dall, Terry) (anh).
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Dall, Terry)Attorney Terry S. Dall added to party The Hertz Corporation(pty:dft) (anh).
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene Lofton. Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. served. (De Santis, Thomas) Moified on (anh).
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene Lofton. Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. served. (De Santis, Thomas) (anh).
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene Lofton. Hertz Vehicles, LLC served. (De Santis, Thomas) (anh).
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene Lofton. The Hertz Corporation served. (De Santis, Thomas) (anh).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against The United States of America, The Hertz Corporation, Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., Hertz Vehicles, LLC, Does 1 to 25, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14400825.), filed by Gene Lofton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1673-CAB-AGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (De Santis, Thomas)(zda)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofton v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Vehicles, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Terry S. Dall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Glen Dorgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Lofton
Represented By: Thomas James De Santis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?