Chromy v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Chromy
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2020cv01678
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is hereby rescheduled to 11/16/20 at 9:30 a.m. The parties and counsel should follow the instructions for telephonic appearance unless otherwise instructed by the Court. Confidential ENE statements due 11/9/20. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/9/20. (Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford., Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/16/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.)(no document attached) (src)
September 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, DOES 1 through 100 inclusive, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ishrak, Syed) (mme).
September 18, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ishrak, Syed)Attorney Syed Idris Ishrak added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Syed Idris Ishrak added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft) (mme).
September 8, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Andrews, Tyler)Attorney Tyler R. Andrews added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler R. Andrews added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft) (mme).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/27/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
August 27, 2020 Filing 27 Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford assigned to transfer case from Northern District of Texas. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
August 27, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from the Northern District of Texas; Case Number 3:20-cv-02534-S. Original file received electronically.
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #19 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Arnetha Barnes's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2532 opened); b. Plaintiff Linda Cabrera's case be severed and transferred to the Southern Division of Central District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2533 opened); c. Plaintiff Deborah Chromy's case be severed and transferred to the San Diego Division of the Southern District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2534 opened); d. Plaintiff Galen Head's case be severed and transferred to the Johnstown Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2535 opened); e. Plaintiff Patricia Hill's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Central District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2536 opened); f. Plaintiff Kathy Maldonado's case be severed and transferred to the Wilkes-Barre Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2537 opened); g. Plaintiff McGarrick Powell's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Middle District of Alabama (Civil case 3:20-cv-2538 opened); h. Plaintiff Douglas Smith's case be severed and transferred to the Savannah Division of the Southern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2540 opened). Plaintiff Jacqueline Henry is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this form. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/26/2020) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Comt DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Amalya Brosell-Christy's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. Party Amalya Brosell-Christy terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/25/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Arnetha Barnes, Amalya Brosell-Christy, Linda Cabrera, Deborah Chromy, Galen Head, Patricia Hill, Kathy Maldonado, McGarrick Powell, Douglas Smith re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Arnetha Barnes, Amalya Brosell-Christy, Linda Cabrera, Deborah Chromy, Galen Head, Patricia Hill, Kathy Maldonado, McGarrick Powell, Douglas Smith re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs, MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by Arnetha Barnes, Amalya Brosell-Christy, Linda Cabrera, Deborah Chromy, Galen Head, Patricia Hill, Kathy Maldonado, McGarrick Powell, Douglas Smith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Arnetha Barnes, Amalya Brosell-Christy, Linda Cabrera, Deborah Chromy, Galen Head, Jacqueline Henry, Patricia Hill, Kathy Maldonado, McGarrick Powell, Douglas Smith re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filling Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Arnetha Barnes, Amalya Brosell-Christy, Linda Cabrera, Deborah Chromy, Galen Head, Jacqueline Henry, Patricia Hill, Kathy Maldonado, McGarrick Powell, Douglas Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Arnetha Barnes, Amalya Brosell-Christy, Linda Cabrera, Deborah Chromy, Galen Head, Jacqueline Henry, Patricia Hill, Kathy Maldonado, McGarrick Powell, Douglas Smith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1533-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/11/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10907794) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Citation Issued Bard Peripheral, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) C-6 Citation Issued McKisson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Affidavif of Servce - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Executed Return of Service - C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chromy v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Syed Idris Ishrak
Represented By: Tyler R. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Syed Idris Ishrak
Represented By: Tyler R. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Chromy
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?