Park v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taijin Park
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01738
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Schwin on behalf of Taijin Park (Schwin, Kevin)Attorney Kevin Schwin added to party Taijin Park(pty:pla) (dlg).
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Taijin Park. (Schwin, Kevin) (dlg).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 10/16/2020, Replies due by 11/6/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/11/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Buckley, Aaron) (dlg).
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Alan Buckley on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Buckley, Aaron)Attorney Aaron Alan Buckley added to party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. . (Pena, Evan) (dlg).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Pena, Evan) (dlg).
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California - Imperial County, case number ECU001427. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14453867.), filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration (2))The new case number is 3:20-cv-1738-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Evan Pena
Represented By: Aaron Alan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taijin Park
Represented By: Grace E. Pak
Represented By: Kevin Schwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?