Marquez v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Alonso Stanley Marquez
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Chad Wolf and William P. Barr
Case Number: 3:2020cv01769
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order Dismissing Case. Mail sent to Alonso Stanley Marquez. (bta)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (ECF No. #1 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/13/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (rmc).
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 TRAVERSE filed by Alonso Stanley Marquez. (jms)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN TO PETITION by Matthew Albence, William P. Barr, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration of Ramon Meraz, #3 Proof of Service)(Prime, Caroline) (jms).
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Clark Prime on behalf of Matthew Albence, William P. Barr, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Prime, Caroline)Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party Matthew Albence(pty:res), Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party William P. Barr(pty:res), Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res) (jms).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Respondents are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Petition should not be granted by: (1) filing a written return no later than 9/25/2020; (2) filing copies of all documents, orders, and transcripts relevant to the Petition; and (3) filing a memorandum of law and fact fully stating Respondents position and making a recommendation regarding the need for an evidentiary hearing on the Petition. If Petitioner wishes to reply to the return, he may file a traverse no later than 10/05/2020. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/11/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(A copy of the Petition and this Order was served upon the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of California, Civil Division)(ag)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Matthew Albence, William P. Barr, Chad Wolf, filed by Alonso Stanley Marquez.(Filing fee $5 - receipt number CAS124071) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1769-WQH-BLM. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Caroline Clark Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Caroline Clark Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Caroline Clark Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alonso Stanley Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?