Lazarus v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lazarus
Defendant: Julian C Baker, Stephen R. Biggar, Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Todd S. Young, Edmund P. Harrigan, James Daly, Srdjan R. Stankovic, Laura A. Brege, Stephen R. Davis, Terrence O. Moore, Daniel B. Soland and Michael J. Yang
Case Number: 3:2020cv01774
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard assigned to transfer case from District of Delaware. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:20-cv-00843. Original file received electronically
September 9, 2020 Case transferred to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SO ORDERED Granting #7 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Transfer of Action. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/9/2020. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Stipulation Regarding Transfer of Action, by Elizabeth Lazarus. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 9/9/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond J. DiCamillo on behalf of Laura A. Brege, Acadia Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Julian C. Baker, Stephen R. Biggar, James Daly, Stephen R. Davis, Edmund P. Harrigan, Terrence O. Moore, Daniel B. Soland, Srdjan R. Stankovic, Michael J. Yang, Todd S. Young (DiCamillo, Raymond) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The stipulation for a stay (D.I. #4 ) is DENIED. The parties are ordered to show cause by 9/9/2020, why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/25/2020. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Stay of Action, by Elizabeth Lazarus. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 8/25/2020 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Laura A. Brege, Acadia Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Julian C. Baker, Stephen R. Biggar, James Daly, Stephen R. Davis, Edmund P. Harrigan, Terrence O. Moore, Daniel B. Soland, Srdjan R. Stankovic, Michael J. Yang, Todd S. Young - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3012885.) - filed by Elizabeth Lazarus. (Attachments: #1 Verification to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lazarus v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian C Baker
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Biggar
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd S. Young
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund P. Harrigan
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daly
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srdjan R. Stankovic
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura A. Brege
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Davis
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence O. Moore
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel B. Soland
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Yang
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lazarus
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?