The Manna Ko Group, Inc. v. The Hollis Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Manna Ko Group, Inc.
Defendant: Rachel Hollis, David Hollis and The Hollis Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01798
Filed: September 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 46 REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 6,110,423, 5,679,595, re #45 Order on Motion to Dismiss. cc:USPTO (rmc)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting #44 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/30/2021. (ag)
August 27, 2021 Filing 44 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Teicher, Shannon) (ag).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting #42 Joint Motion to Further Extend Deadlines Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 8/17/2021. (ag)
August 16, 2021 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Order Further Extending Deadlines Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings by The Manna Ko Group, Inc.. (Wagner, Ben) (ag).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Vacating Telephonic Discovery Conference. The Court VACATES the telephonic Discovery Conference on 7/21/2021, at 12:00 p.m. and the related deadline for submission of letter briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/14/2021.(ag)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference. A telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 7/21/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/12/2021.(ag)
July 7, 2021 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/7/2021. Further Telephonic Case Management Conference SET for 9/10/2021, at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Counsel for Plaintiff is ORDERED to coordinate the joint call to chambers for the TCMC at (619) 557-6632.(Plaintiff Attorney Oscar Figueroa). (Defendant Attorney Devanshi Somaya). (no document attached) (jxb)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #37 Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Cutoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/6/2021. (ag)
July 2, 2021 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings by The Manna Ko Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings)(Figueroa, Oscar) Emailed attorney to email proposed orders directly to chambers (ag).
June 2, 2021 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 6/2/2021. Counsel for the parties are ORDERED to place a joint call to chambers on June 8, 2021 to inform the Court whether they have resolved their discovery disputes. (Plaintiff Attorneys Ben Wagner; Oscar Figueroa). (Defendant Attorneys Shannon Teicher; Katherine Harwood; Devanshi Somaya; Carl Butzer). (no document attached) (jxb)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference. A telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 6/2/2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 5/21/2021.(ag)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Devanshi Somaya, re #33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/24/2021.(rmc)
May 21, 2021 Filing 33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15752637.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Somaya, Devanshi) (rmc).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #31 Joint Motion and Stipulation re Motion to Compel Deadline Relating to First Set of Discovery Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 4/26/2021. (ag)
April 23, 2021 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Compel Relating to First Set of Discovery Requests by The Manna Ko Group, Inc.. (Wagner, Ben) (ag).
April 7, 2021 Filing 30 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/7/2021. (Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to arrange the joint call to chambers.) (Plaintiff Attorney Ben Wagner).(Defendant Attorneys Shannon Teicher; Katherine Harwood; Devanshi Somaya). (no document attached) (jxb)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #26 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order and ESI Order with Modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 1/29/2021.(ag)
January 26, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC (Haggerty, William) (ag).
January 26, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC. (Haggerty, William) (ag).
January 26, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Production Protocol by David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order, #2 Stipulation and Proposed Order re Production Protocol)(Haggerty, William) Emailed attorney to email proposed orders directly to chambers (ag).
January 14, 2021 Filing 25 Counter-defendant's ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by The Manna Ko Group, Inc..(Wagner, Ben) (ag).
January 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar Asiris Figueroa on behalf of The Manna Ko Group, Inc. (Figueroa, Oscar)Attorney Oscar Asiris Figueroa added to party The Manna Ko Group, Inc.(pty:pla) (ag).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Case Management Conference was held on 1/7/2021. A telephonic-attorneys only Case Management Conference is set for 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 2/25/2022 at 9:30 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 4/1/2022. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/8/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Q. Hayes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 1/8/2021.(ag)
January 7, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 1/7/2021. Scheduling Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Ben Wagner). (Defendant Attorneys Shannon Teicher; Katherine Harwood). (no document attached) (jxb)
December 30, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by The Manna Ko Group, Inc. (Wagner, Ben) (jmr).
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY: RECORD of ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims (ECF No. #19 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff The Manna Ko Group, Inc. shall file a responsive pleading to Defendants' answer and counterclaims (ECF No. #17 ) on or before January 15, 2021. (no document attached) (jmo)
December 18, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by The Manna Ko Group, Inc.. (Wagner, Ben) (jmo).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Telephonic Case Management Conference. The Court will hold a telephonic, attorneys-only Case Management Conference on 1/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. The parties must file a Joint Discovery Plan no later than 12/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 12/11/2020. (jdt)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC, David Hollis by Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC, David Hollis.(Haggerty, William) (ag).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Shannon Zmud Teicher (Re: ECF No. #14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/3/2020.(jrd)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Zoom Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 12/3/2020. The case did not settle. (Plaintiff Attorney Ben Wagner). (Defendant Attorneys Shannon Teicher; Carl Butzer; Katherine Hardwood). (no document attached) (jxb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14957173.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Teicher, Shannon) (rmc).
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Katherine M. Harwood by William C Haggerty on behalf of David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC (Haggerty, William) (ag).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Joint Motion to Set Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 12/3/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 11/13/2020. (ag)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by The Manna Ko Group, Inc.. (Wagner, Ben) (ag).
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Answer or Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #9 ) is GRANTED. Defendants The Hollis Company, LLC; Rachel Hollis; and David Hollis shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff The Manna Ko Group, Inc.'s Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) on or before December 10, 2020. (no document attached) (ag)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or Respond to Complaint by David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC. (Haggerty, William) (ag).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Carl Butzer, re #7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/9/2020.(rmc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14815670.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Butzer, Carl)(jrd)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to the Initial Complaint (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED. Defendants The Hollis Company, LLC, Rachel Hollis, and David Hollis shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff The Manna Ko Group, Inc.'s Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) on or before November 15, 2020. (no document attached) (ag)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC. (Haggerty, William)Attorney William C Haggerty added to party David Hollis(pty:dft), Attorney William C Haggerty added to party Rachel Hollis(pty:dft), Attorney William C Haggerty added to party The Hollis Company, LLC(pty:dft) (ag).
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Manna Ko Group, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Wagner, Ben) (ag).
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt)
September 13, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6,110,423*, *5,679,595* cc:USPTO (sjt)
September 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against David Hollis, Rachel Hollis, The Hollis Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14495745). Filed by The Manna Ko Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E 1, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1798-WQH-MSB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Wagner, Ben)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Manna Ko Group, Inc. v. The Hollis Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Manna Ko Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ben Lewis Wagner
Represented By: Oscar Asiris Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Hollis
Represented By: William C Haggerty
Represented By: Carl C. Butzer
Represented By: Devanshi Somaya
Represented By: Shannon Melissa Zmud Teicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hollis
Represented By: William C Haggerty
Represented By: Carl C. Butzer
Represented By: Devanshi Somaya
Represented By: Shannon Melissa Zmud Teicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hollis Company, LLC
Represented By: William C Haggerty
Represented By: Carl C. Butzer
Represented By: Devanshi Somaya
Represented By: Shannon Melissa Zmud Teicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?