Richmond v. Mikkelson et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Richmond
Defendant: Snopes Media Group, Inc., Brad Westbrook, David Mikkelson and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv01925
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Richmond, as to Snopes Media Group, Inc.. (Hrutkay, Matthew) (sjt).
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Richmond. Brad Westbrook served. (Hrutkay, Matthew) (jdt).
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Richmond, as to David Mikkelson. (Hrutkay, Matthew) (jdt).
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Christopher Richmond ECF No. 4. (Hrutkay, Matthew) (jdt).
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 ***WITHDRAWN per ECF #5 *** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Richmond, as to David Mikkelson. (Hrutkay, Matthew). QC email to w/d and refile. Not flattened. (jdt). Modified on 10/7/2020 to withdraw (jdt).
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1925-W-KSC.(no document attached) (mme)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Doe Defendants 1-10, David Mikkelson, Snopes Media Group, Inc., Brad Westbrook ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14575612.), filed by Christopher Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1925-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Hrutkay, Matthew)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond v. Mikkelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snopes Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mikkelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Richmond
Represented By: Matthew J. Hrutkay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?