Valencia-Ayala et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: David Orellana-Ardon, Andrea Contreras-Vergara, Pedro Valencia-Ayala, Juan Velazquez-Morales, Jeronimo Fernandez-Ferrer, Armando Escobar-Mejia, Oliser Hernandez, Mauro Varela-Gomez, Rigoberto Campos-Atrisco, Alvaro Pastor-Narcizo, Filadelfo Morales-Roblero, Elizeo Velazquez-Hernandez, Luis Chavac-Boror, Erick Aranda-Moreno, Bertin Cruz-Ibarra, Fernando Girarte-Alcala and Jose Carillo-Valdez
Defendant: Gregory Archambeault, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tony H. Pham, Aaron Heitke, Rodney S. Scott and Chad Wolf
Amicus Curiae: American Immigration Lawyers Association (AILA)
Case Number: 3:2020cv02060
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall submit their joint supplement to the record no later than January 4, 2021. All other aspects of the November 30, 2020 order remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/17/2020. (mme)
December 17, 2020 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Supplemental Submission by Gregory Archambeault, Aaron Heitke, Tony H. Pham, Rodney S. Scott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Parker, Katherine) (mme).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Re: Preliminary Injunction Briefing. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/30/2020. (jmr) (jms).
November 30, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Order regarding Preliminary Injunction Briefing by Gregory Archambeault, Aaron Heitke, Tony H. Pham, Rodney S. Scott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Parker, Katherine) (mme).
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 11/10/2020 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2021. (akr)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order is GRANTED. The Court ENJOINS the Department of Homeland Security and its sub-agencies from making a civil immigration arrest of any individual appearing in federal court in the Southern District of California while that individual is present in, or traveling to and from, court. This Order will expire in fourteen (14) days, on November 30, 2020, unless extended for good cause or by Defendants consent. The parties are ordered to meet and confer by no later than November 23, 2020, to attempt resolution of these matters. Absent resolution, the matter will be heard on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction. The parties shall determine a mutually agreeable hearing date and briefing schedule and submit proposed dates to the Court prior to the expiration of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/16/2020. (mme)
November 10, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2020 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Jeremy Delicino, James Johnson present in court). (Defendant Attorney Colin McDonald, Samuel Bettwy present in court. Katherine Parker telephonically). (no document attached) (jak)
November 10, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (Attachments: #1 1)(mme)
November 9, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erick Aranda-Moreno, Rigoberto Campos-Atrisco, Elizeo Velazquez-Hernandez.New Summons Requested. (Johnson, James) (mme). QC mail sent on 11/10/2020 re change of address (rmc).
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Erick Aranda-Moreno, Rigoberto Campos-Atrisco, Luis Chavac-Boror, Andrea Contreras-Vergara, Bertin Cruz-Ibarra, Armando Escobar-Mejia, Jeronimo Fernandez-Ferrer, Oliser Hernandez, Filadelfo Morales-Roblero, David Orellana-Ardon, Alvaro Pastor-Narcizo, Pedro Valencia-Ayala, Mauro Varela-Gomez, Elizeo Velazquez-Hernandez, Juan Velazquez-Morales. (Johnson, James) (mme).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Plaintiffs Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may submit a reply of twenty-two (22) pages in support of their motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/4/2020. (mme)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Erick Aranda-Moreno, Rigoberto Campos-Atrisco, Luis Chavac-Boror, Andrea Contreras-Vergara, Bertin Cruz-Ibarra, Armando Escobar-Mejia, Jeronimo Fernandez-Ferrer, Oliser Hernandez, Filadelfo Morales-Roblero, David Orellana-Ardon, Alvaro Pastor-Narcizo, Pedro Valencia-Ayala, Mauro Varela-Gomez, Elizeo Velazquez-Hernandez, Juan Velazquez-Morales. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Johnson in support of motion)(Johnson, James) (mme).
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gregory Archambeault, Aaron Heitke, Tony H. Pham, Rodney S. Scott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration SBPA Blazer, #4 Declaration BPA Frontiera)(Bettwy, Samuel) (mme).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Defendants Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/29/2020. (mme)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by Gregory Archambeault, Aaron Heitke, Tony H. Pham, Rodney S. Scott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Parker)(Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Gregory Archambeault(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Aaron Heitke(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Tony H. Pham(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Rodney S. Scott(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft) (mme).
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by American Immigration Lawyers Association (AILA). (Nietor, Andrew) Modified on 10/26/2020 to correct document title (mme).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/26/2020. (mme)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (unopposed) by American Immigration Lawyers Association (AILA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit amicus curiae)(Nietor, Andrew)Attorney Andrew K Nietor added to party American Immigration Lawyers Association (AILA)(pty:am) (mme).
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 10/21/2020. There will be a 3-week suspension of civil arrests by ICE and CBP. ( Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Jeremy Delicino present in court, James Johnson telephonically). (Defendant Attorney All telephonically: Katherine Parker, Samuel Bettwy, Carlos Cantu, David Leshner, Colin McDonald). (no document attached) (jak)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) Suspending Civil Arrest and (2) Setting Briefing Schedule. Respondent-Defendants shall file a response to Petitioner-Plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order on or before October 30, 2020. Petitioner-Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before November 4, 2020. Hearing on the motion is set for November 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/21/202.(mme)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Status Conference re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. The parties may appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/20/2020.(mme)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Erick Aranda-Moreno, Rigoberto Campos-Atrisco, Luis Chavac-Boror, Andrea Contreras-Vergara, Bertin Cruz-Ibarra, Armando Escobar-Mejia, Jeronimo Fernandez-Ferrer, Oliser Hernandez, Filadelfo Morales-Roblero, David Orellana-Ardon, Alvaro Pastor-Narcizo, Pedro Valencia-Ayala, Mauro Varela-Gomez, Elizeo Velazquez-Hernandez, Juan Velazquez-Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits and Declarations in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration Ex Parte Application for TRO and Supporting Declaration of James M. Johnson)(Johnson, James) (mme).
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory Archambeault, Aaron Heitke, Tony H. Pham, Rodney S. Scott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed by Mauro Varela-Gomez, David Orellana-Ardon, Bertin Cruz-Ibarra, Luis Chavac-Boror, Pedro Valencia-Ayala, Alvaro Pastor-Narcizo, Jeronimo Fernandez-Ferrer, Erick Aranda-Moreno, Rigoberto Campos-Atrisco, Juan Velazquez-Morales, Filadelfo Morales-Roblero, Oliser Hernandez, Armando Escobar-Mejia, Elizeo Velazquez-Hernandez, Andrea Contreras-Vergara.(Filing fee $400 - receipt number BCASDC-14710489) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2060-DMS-KSC. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Johnson, James)(jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia-Ayala et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Orellana-Ardon
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Contreras-Vergara
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Valencia-Ayala
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Velazquez-Morales
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeronimo Fernandez-Ferrer
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Escobar-Mejia
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliser Hernandez
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Varela-Gomez
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Campos-Atrisco
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Pastor-Narcizo
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filadelfo Morales-Roblero
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizeo Velazquez-Hernandez
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Chavac-Boror
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Aranda-Moreno
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertin Cruz-Ibarra
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Delicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Girarte-Alcala
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Carillo-Valdez
Represented By: James Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony H. Pham
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Heitke
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney S. Scott
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Immigration Lawyers Association (AILA)
Represented By: Andrew K Nietor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?