Santos v. LAPD Downtown Los Angeles
Plaintiff: Elliot J. Santos
Defendant: The Courtland Housing SRO and LAPD Downtown Los Angeles
Case Number: 3:2020cv02128
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Todd W Robinson
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Transfer Letter Received from Central District of California. Case number in other court is 2:20 cv10939 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Transfer Letter Received from Central District of California. Case number in other court is 20-cv-10675 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Western Division*.*350 West 1st Street, STE 4311**Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565*. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmr)(jms).
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Elliot J. Santos. (vxc)(dsn)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elliot J. Santos. (vxc) (dsn)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against LAPD Downtown Los Angeles, IFP Filed, filed by Elliot J. Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2128-NLS. Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is assigned to the case. (Elliot J. Santos)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. LAPD Downtown Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Courtland Housing SRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Downtown Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot J. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?