Vista Verde Master Association v. Broker Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vista Verde Master Association
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, - San Diego County Department of Child Support Services, -, Broker Solutions, Inc. a Corporation doing business as New American Funding, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Otay Water District and MCT Group
Case Number: 3:2020cv02134
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 ac
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Joint Motion Disclaiming MERS' Interest in the Property at Issue and Dismissal from the Instant Action. MERS disclaims any and all interest in the Property and/or the Deed of Trust (the "DOT"). The Joint Motion shall have no effect, impact, or in any way modify, release, or impair the rights or obligations of the parties to the DOT, including without limitation, MERS' successors and assigns to the DOT and other loan documents secured by the DOT. Plaintiff cannot pursue any claims or seek any judgment against MERS inthe instant action for money damages, attorneys' fees and costs, and any other related relief. MERS is hereby dismissed from the instant action. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/10/2020.(mme)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #12 Motion Regarding Defendant Lakeview Servicing LLC's Lien Priority and Limited Participation. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/10/2020. (mme)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION Re: Defendant MERS' Disclaimer of Interest and Dismissal From the Instant Action by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Kane, Patrick)Attorney Patrick J. Kane added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf).
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION Re: Defendant Lakeview Servicing LLC's Lien Priority and Limited Participation by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. (Kane, Patrick) (tcf).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/20/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/1/2020.(mme)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. (Kane, Patrick) (mme).
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Internal Revenue Service.(Green, Tijuhna) (mme).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Extend Defendant Lakeview Servicing LLC's Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Lakeview Servicing LLC may file its answer or responsive pleading on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/19/2020. (mme)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. (Kane, Patrick) (mme).
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Kane on behalf of Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Kane, Patrick)Attorney Patrick J. Kane added to party Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft) (mme).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant IRS may file its answer or responsive pleading on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/9/2020. (mme)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Internal Revenue Service. (Green, Tijuhna) (mme).
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Blair James on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (James, Morgan)Attorney Morgan Blair James added to party Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft) (mme).
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Internal Revenue Service. (vxc) (dsn)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00031995-CU-OR-CTL., No Fee Required, filed by Vista Verde Master Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2134-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vista Verde Master Association v. Broker Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Tijuhna Green
Represented By: Morgan Blair James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - San Diego County Department of Child Support Services, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broker Solutions, Inc. a Corporation doing business as New American Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otay Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCT Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Verde Master Association
Represented By: Joseph Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?