McAdams v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Pia McAdams
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Mr. Cooper and Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 3:2020cv02202
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion. No later than January 14, 2021, Plaintiff shall file her first amended complaint. No later than February 4, 2021, Defendant shall file its response to the first amended complaint. Defendants pending motion to dismiss (doc. no. 12) is denied as moot. The hearing date set for January 19, 2021 is vacated. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/17/2020. (jpp) (dlg).
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint, Joint MOTION to Vacate Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Currently Set for January 19, 2021 by Pia McAdams. (Houchin, Michael) (jpp).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #13 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, from Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1(b) No hearing date obtained from chambers; ECF 2(g)(2) Documents not filed as separate attachments; ECF 2(k) -- Lacking table of contents of exhibits; exhibits not properly paginated; Standing Order for Civil Cases, Hon. M. James Lorenz, p.2 To the extent the filing was intended as an ex parte application, no declaration evidencing a meeting and conference prior to filing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/14/2020.(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2020: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STRICKEN PER ORDER #14 - MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion to Dismiss)(Kane, Patrick) (jpp).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Kane, Patrick) (jpp).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Nationstar Mortgage LLC D/B/A Mr. Cooper's Ex Parte Application to Enlarge the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. No later than 12/10/2020, Nationstar shall file its response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/19/2020. (jrm)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY - Other re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Kane, Patrick) (jrm).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Pia McAdams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald A. Marron in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit 1)(Marron, Ronald) (jrm).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Kane, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kane, Patrick) (jpp).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisa Pineda on behalf of Pia McAdams (Pineda, Elisa)Attorney Elisa Pineda added to party Pia McAdams(pty:pla) (jpp).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lilach Halperin on behalf of Pia McAdams (Halperin, Lilach)Attorney Lilach Halperin added to party Pia McAdams(pty:pla) (jpp).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kas L. Gallucci on behalf of Pia McAdams (Gallucci, Kas)Attorney Kas L. Gallucci added to party Pia McAdams(pty:pla) (jpp).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Houchin on behalf of Pia McAdams (Houchin, Michael)Attorney Michael Houchin added to party Pia McAdams(pty:pla) (jpp).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis M. Wood on behalf of Pia McAdams (Wood, Alexis)Attorney Alexis M. Wood added to party Pia McAdams(pty:pla) (jpp).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. (formerly known as WMIH Corp.) for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (mcb) Modified to reflect corporate parent statuses on 11/13/2020 (rmc).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California, case number 37-2020-00033451-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14856271.), filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2202-L-BLM. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(mcb) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAdams v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC. a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Patrick J. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Patrick J. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pia McAdams
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Represented By: Alexis M. Wood
Represented By: Michael Houchin
Represented By: Lilach Halperin
Represented By: Kas L. Gallucci
Represented By: Elisa Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?