Cota v. Alo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julissa Cota
Defendant: Alo, LLC and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2020cv02254
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Julissa Cota (Coelho, Thiago) (jpp).
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER - Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by video conference held 1/12/201. Telephonic, counsel-only Settlement Disposition Conference set for 2/26/2021 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (jpp) (dlg).
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #4 : Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 1/12/2021 by video conference. The case settled. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Thiago Coelho) (Defendant Attorney Dinah Ortiz) (Julissa Cota; Alyson Wilson) (no document attached) (mjg)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: An e-mail from each party providing ENE participant contact information was due to the Court no later than 1/8/2021. The Court is not in receipt of an e-mail from Plaintiff. Accordingly, no later than today, 1/11/2021, at 12:00 PM, Plaintiff shall e-mail the Court the participant contact information required by paragraph 5 of the Mandatory Directions for Zoom Video Conference Participation (attached to the Court's 12/17/2020 Order (ECF No. #4 )). (no document attached) (mjg)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Dinah X. Ortiz by Andrew Patrick Holland on behalf of Alo, LLC (Holland, Andrew) (jpp).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") Statements were due to the Court no later than 1/5/2021. (ECF No. #4 .) The Court is not in receipt of Defendant's ENE Statement. Accordingly, no later than 1/7/2021, at 9:00 AM, Defendant shall lodge its ENE Statement via e-mail at efile_Burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov. Defendant's ENE Statement shall address why it is being lodged after the Court-ordered deadline. FURTHER, no later than 1/7/2021, at 9:00 AM, Plaintiff shall lodge a supplement to her ENE Statement, such that it complies with paragraph 4 of the Court's 12/17/2020 Order (ECF No. #4 ), which provides: "The statement shall also list all attorney and non-attorney conference participants for that side, including the name(s) and title(s)/position(s) of the party/party representative(s) who will appear and have settlement authority at the conference." (no document attached) (mjg)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Coelho, Thiago) (jpp).
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses 1-11 in Defendant Alo, LLC's Answer by Julissa Cota. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Coelho, Thiago) (jpp).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; and (2) Setting Rule 26 compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/12/2021 at 9:00am. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 12/16/2020.(jpp) (dlg).
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alo, LLC.(Holland, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Patrick Holland added to party Alo, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb) (rmc).
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Alo, LLC, Does 1 to 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14902409.), filed by Julissa Cota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Covr Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2254-L-JLB. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Coelho, Thiago)(mcb) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cota v. Alo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julissa Cota
Represented By: Thiago M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alo, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?