Banks v. Buchhauser et al
Plaintiff: Dwight Banks
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Renee Buchhauser, Peter Buchhauser, John Buchhauser doing business as The Bagger Gourmet and Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02276
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by John Buchhauser, Peter Buchhauser, Renee Buchhauser, Does 1-10, Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC. (Kosmo, Frederick) (jdt).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Doc. #5 ). Defendants John Buchhauser dba the Bagger Gourmet, Peter Buchhauser, Renee Buchhauser, and Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC now have until 1/15/2021 to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/4/2021. (jdt)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by John Buchhauser, Peter Buchhauser, Renee Buchhauser, Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC. (Kosmo, Frederick)Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party John Buchhauser (pty:dft), Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party Peter Buchhauser (pty:dft), Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party Renee Buchhauser (pty:dft), Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwight Banks. Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC served. (Taibi, Michael) (jdt).
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb) (rmc).
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Dwight Banks. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mcb) (rmc).
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Buchhauser, Peter Buchhauser, Renee Buchhauser, Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC, Does 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14917041.), filed by Dwight Banks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2276-W-MSB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Taibi, Michael)(mcb) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Buchhauser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Buchhauser
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Buchhauser
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Buchhauser doing business as The Bagger Gourmet
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Banks
Represented By: Michael A. Taibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?