Ham v. Kohls, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacey Ham
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02414
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kohl's, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's, Inc... (Boykins, Tahir) (jmo).
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kohl's, Inc..(Boykins, Tahir) (jmo).
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacey Ham. Kohl's, Inc. served. (Angelo, Joseph) (jmo).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (ECF No. #3 ). Defendant shall have until 2/4/2021 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/30/20. (jmo)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kohl's, Inc.. (Boykins, Tahir)Attorney Tahir L. Boykins added to party Kohl's, Inc. (pty:dft) (jmo).
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kohl's, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15032996.), filed by Stacey Ham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2414-BAS-RBB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Angelo, Joseph)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ham v. Kohls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc.
Represented By: Tahir L. Boykins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Ham
Represented By: Joseph Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?