Kassab v. MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Joandark Kassab
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02422
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Joandark Kassab (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff shall pay the requisite filing fee of $400.00 on or before 2/22/2021. If Plaintiff fails to submit payment on or before 2/22/2021, the Court will close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/21/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the requisite filing fee of $400.00 on or before February 22, 2021. If Plaintiff fails to submit payment on or before February 22, 2021, the Court will close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/23/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joandark Kassab. (smd) (sjt).
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against MUFG Union Bank, N.A., IFP Filed, filed by Joandark Kassab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2422-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kassab v. MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joandark Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?