Roberts et al v. Solari Enterprise Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tony Lee-Vant Roberts Wright and Tina Louise Roberts
Defendant: Solari Enterprise Inc. and Fedex.com
Case Number: 3:2020cv02476
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1333in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Rejecting Document: USPS Receipts, from Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 5.1: Improper format, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/11/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2021: #1 Rejected Document) (tcf).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (1) Denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; (2) Dismissing without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Complaint; and (3) Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel (ECF Nos. #1 , #2 , #3 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED; 2. Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; 3. Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT; and 4. Plaintiffs are GRANTED thirty (30) days from the date on which this Order is electronically docketed to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies identified above. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/6/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 USPS Receipts by Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. (tcf)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: USPS Receipts, from Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/22/2020. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/28/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tina Louise Roberts. (mcb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tina Louise Roberts. (mcb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Tina Louise Roberts, Tony Lee-Vant Roberts Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2476-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Roberts, Tina)(mcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. Solari Enterprise Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solari Enterprise Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lee-Vant Roberts Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?