G.C. v. San Diego Unified School District
Plaintiff: G.C.
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2021cv00019
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Petition to Appoint a Guardian ad Litem. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/17/2021. (jpp) (dlg).
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by G.C.. (Prado, Tania) (jpp).
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21-cv-0019-L-BGS. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/7/2021. (tcf)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Fee for Civil Case Opening: $ 402, receipt number ACASDC-15165617, Paid on 1/6/2021. (no document attached) (Prado, Tania) (tcf).
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by G.C. (smd) (sjt).
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against San Diego Unified School District ( Filing fee $ 402 DUE.), filed by G.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:21-cv-19-JLS-BGS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Prado, Tania)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.C. v. San Diego Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.C.
Represented By: Tania Prado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?