Gross v. Midland Credit Management. Inc.
Plaintiff: Cheskel Gross
Defendant: Midland Credit Management. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00072
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Midland Credit Management. Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group for Midland Credit Management. Inc. (Strickland, Leah) (tcf).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. A videoconference Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference is set for 4/8/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. An attorneys-only telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/2/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. A joint discovery plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Gallo on or before 3/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/23/2021. (tcf)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F Landers on behalf of Midland Credit Management. Inc. (Landers, Thomas)Attorney Thomas F Landers added to party Midland Credit Management. Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf).
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management. Inc. (Strickland, Leah) (tcf).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Defendant must file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/19/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/8/2021. (tcf)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Midland Credit Management. Inc. (Strickland, Leah)Attorney Leah Suzanne Strickland added to party Midland Credit Management. Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf).
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheskel Gross. Midland Credit Management. Inc. served. (Sanders, Craig) (tcf).
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Midland Credit Management. Inc. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15205427.), filed by Cheskel Gross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:21-cv-72-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Sanders, Craig)(zda)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. Midland Credit Management. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheskel Gross
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management. Inc.
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Strickland
Represented By: Thomas F Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?