Sukumar v. International Olympic Committee et al
Plaintiff: Ponani Sukumar
Defendant: International Olympic Committee and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2021cv00215
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Responses due by 4/23/2021, Replies due by 5/7/2021. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/1/21.(dlg)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Olympic Committee. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Caterina, Tiffany)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by International Olympic Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Tiffany R. Caterina, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tiffany R. Caterina)(Caterina, Tiffany) (dlg).
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Olympic Committee. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Caterina, Tiffany) QC email, incorrect attorney filed, attorney should withdraw and refile (dlg).
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by International Olympic Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Tiffany R. Caterina, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tiffany R. Caterina)(Caterina, Tiffany) QC email, incorrect attorney filed. Attorney should withdraw and refile correctly (dlg).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kimberly Maynard, re #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/25/2021.(rmc)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Christopher R. Chase, re #5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/25/2021.(rmc)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Caterina on behalf of International Olympic Committee (Caterina, Tiffany)Attorney Tiffany R. Caterina added to party International Olympic Committee(pty:dft) (jrm).
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15555045.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Chase, Christopher) (rmc).
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15555000.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Maynard, Kimberly) (rmc).
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Samet on behalf of International Olympic Committee (Samet, Matthew)Attorney Matthew C. Samet added to party International Olympic Committee(pty:dft) (jmr).
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb) (jms).
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against International Olympic Committee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15332681.), filed by Ponani Sukumar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-215-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Mullen, Martin)(mcb) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sukumar v. International Olympic Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Olympic Committee
Represented By: Kimberly Marie Maynard
Represented By: Christopher R. Chase
Represented By: Matthew C. Samet
Represented By: Tiffany R. Caterina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ponani Sukumar
Represented By: Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?