Jackson v. Solo Group Managment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Jackson
Defendant: Does 1-10, Solo Group Managment, Inc. doing business as Monello and Jman at the Q, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00268
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Confirming Settlement Setting Deadline to File Voluntary Dismissal or Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/26/2021.(anh)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Jerry Jackson re #6 Notice of Settlement filed by Jerry Jackson, #5 Notice of Settlement filed by Jerry Jackson . (Taibi, Michael) (anh).
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Jerry Jackson (Taibi, Michael) (anh).
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 **Withdrawn per doc. no. #8 **NOTICE of Settlement by Jerry Jackson (Taibi, Michael)(anh).
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 **Withdrawn per doc. no. #8 **NOTICE of Settlement by Jerry Jackson (Taibi, Michael) (anh).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Declining Supplemental Jurisdiction Over State Law Claim. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/16/2021.(anh)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Jerry Jackson. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mcb)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Jman at the Q, L.P., Solo Group Managment, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15375719.), filed by Jerry Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:21-cv-268-CAB-BLM. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Taibi, Michael)(mcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Solo Group Managment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solo Group Managment, Inc. doing business as Monello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jman at the Q, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Jackson
Represented By: Michael A. Taibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?