Ohio Resources LLC v. King Aerospace Commercial Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ohio Resources LLC
Defendant: King Aerospace Commercial Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00528
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Following Status Conference. Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before May 27, 2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/27/2021.(mme)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/27/2021. (Plaintiff Attorney Todd Eagan, Brian Wolf). (Defendant Attorney Terhar, Hembree). (no document attached) (jak)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Resources LLC. King Aerospace Commercial Corporation, Inc. served. (Wolf, Brian)(mme).
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (dlg).
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Resources LLC identifying Other Affiliate Tony Robbins Productions, Inc. for Ohio Resources LLC.. (fth) (dlg).
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against King Aerospace Commercial Corporation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15557700.), filed by Ohio Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-528-DMS-DEB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Wolf, Brian)(fth) (dlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Resources LLC v. King Aerospace Commercial Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Aerospace Commercial Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Resources LLC
Represented By: Brian G. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?