Lotze et al v. Total Lender Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Filipinio Flash, LLC, Laura Ohman, Matthew Lotze and The Filipinoflash, LLC
Defendant: Allrise Capital, Inc., Allrise Real Estate Credit Fund, LP, American Pacific Mortgage, Allrise Inc., Vladimir Nikolayevich Evseev, Does 1 through 100, Allrise Direct Lending LLC doing business as Allrise Financial Group, Inc., Rusian Zunurov, Royal Development, Inc., Total Lender Solutions, Inc., Del Toro Loan Servicing, Inc. and Allrise Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00598
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint by Total Lender Solutions, Inc.. (Silverman, Timothy)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to extend time for Defendants to respond to First Amended Complaint to on or before 6/09/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/24/2021. Modified on 5/24/2021 to replace image, NEF resent to all parties. (jpp)(dlg).
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Total Lender Solutions, Inc.. (Silverman, Timothy)Attorney Timothy J Silverman added to party Total Lender Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs, filed by Matthew Lotze. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Clayton, James) (tcf).
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Matthew Lotze re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Matthew Lotze . (Clayton, James) (tcf).
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #7 *** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs, filed by Matthew Lotze. (Clayton, James) (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 4/22/2021 (tcf).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying #2 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/7/2021. (tcf)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (dlg).
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)(dlg).
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Matthew Lotze, Laura Ohman, The Filipinio Flash, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Matthew Lotze, #2 Declaration of Attorney James L. Clayton)(fth) (dlg)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Total Lender Solutions, Inc., Del Toro Loan Servicing, Inc., Allrise Real Estate Credit Fund, LP, Allrise Direct Lending LLC, Allrise Capital, Inc., Allrise Inc., Royal Development, Inc., American Pacific Mortgage, Vladimir Nikolayevich Evseev, Rusian Zunurov, Does 1 through 100, ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15589381.), filed by Laura Ohman, Matthew Lotze, The Filipinio Flash, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-598-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Clayton, James)(fth) (dlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotze et al v. Total Lender Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allrise Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allrise Real Estate Credit Fund, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pacific Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allrise Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir Nikolayevich Evseev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allrise Direct Lending LLC doing business as Allrise Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusian Zunurov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Lender Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Toro Loan Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allrise Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Filipinio Flash, LLC
Represented By: James Lewis Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ohman
Represented By: James Lewis Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lotze
Represented By: James Lewis Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Filipinoflash, LLC
Represented By: James Lewis Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?