Henderson v. Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kyel Henderson
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10 and Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00614
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by John L Viola (Viola, John) (mme).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Joint Motion to Stay Action and Arbitrate Claims. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's claims in this action will be submitted to arbitration pursuant to Charter's Solution Channel program guidelines, and Plaintiff shall file his claims via Solution Channel; 2. This action will be and hereby is STAYED pending the resolution of the arbitration proceedings; and 3. The parties are ordered to file a status report on the progress of the arbitration every 90 days as well as within ten (10) days of completion of the arbitration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/5/2021. (tcf)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. In light of the #6 Joint MOTION to Stay Action and Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration, the #3 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference and all dates and deadlines therein are VACATED. In the event the joint motion is denied, the parties shall jointly notify the Court of the ruling within two court days of the ruling. SO ORDERED by Judge William V. Gallo on May 4, 2021.(no document attached) (ajf)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Charter Communications, LLC, Corporate Parent Kyel Henderson for Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC. (Riccomini, Kacey) (tcf).
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC. (Riccomini, Kacey) (tcf).
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Action and Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration by Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Joint Motion Re Arbitration)(Riccomini, Kacey)Attorney Kacey Renee Riccomini added to party Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: proposed order attached (tcf).
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Angeloff on behalf of Kyel Henderson (Angeloff, David)Attorney David Michael Angeloff added to party Kyel Henderson(pty:plat) (mme).
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ji-In Houck on behalf of Kyel Henderson (Houck, Ji-In)Attorney Ji-In Houck added to party Kyel Henderson(pty:pla) (mme).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER for: (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference; and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/11/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/12/2021.(mme)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC. (zda) (jms).
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15603475.), filed by Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Kacey R. Riccomini in Support of Defendant Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC's Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)The new case number is 3:21-cv-614-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(zda) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyel Henderson
Represented By: Cindy Jane Hickox
Represented By: Ji-In Houck
Represented By: David Michael Angeloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: John L Viola
Represented By: Kacey Renee Riccomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?