Martinez et al v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Company et al
Plaintiff: Drew Martinez and Tyon Hood
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company and Does l through 50
Case Number: 3:2021cv00663
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine T. LeVu)(LeVu, Christine) (jrm).
May 28, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Connaughton, E) (jrm).
May 24, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY - Other re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration)(Connaughton, E) (jrm).
May 13, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Motion Hearing is hereby continued to 8/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia to be held concurrently with the Motion to Remand.(no document attached) (sc)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Responses due by 5/28/2021; Replies due by 6/4/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court)(Herman, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Consolidate filed by Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine T. LeVu, #2 Request for Judicial Notice of Exhibits 1-3)(LeVu, Christine)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Clarifying [Doc. No. 17] Notice of Document Discrepancy, Plaintiffs are granted leave to refile their Opposition to Defendant's #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Opposition due to 5/17/2021; Reply due by 5/24/2021. Motion hearing remains as previously scheduled.(no document attached) (sc)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion,, from Plaintiffs Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Notice of Errata Prohibited. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document)(jrm)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, from Plaintiffs Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 7.1 or 47.1 - Briefs or memorandum exceed length restrictions OTHER: Chambers Rules II.A - Objections relating to the motion should be set forth in the parties opposition or reply. No separate statement of objections will be allowed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document)(jrm)
May 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Pena on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Pena, Evan)Attorney Evan Pena added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jrm).
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Kagan on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Kagan, Kelly)Attorney Kelly E. Kagan added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jrm).
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 ***Document Stricken per Order #18 *** RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; AND ALL DOCUMENTS FILED IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez. (LeVu, Christine)(jrm). Modified to Strike on 5/12/2021 (jrm). (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/12/2021) (jrm).
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Continued Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Motion Hearing Continued to 7/29/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (no document attached) (sc)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 ***Document Stricken per Order #17 *** RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Consolidate filed by Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE T. LEVU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, # 3 PLAINTIFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, # 4 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)(LeVu, Christine) (jrm). Modified to strike on 5/12/2021 (jrm). (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/12/2021) (jrm).
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Continued Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the motion hearing is hereby continued to 7/22/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine T. LeVu on behalf of Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez (LeVu, Christine)Attorney Christine T. LeVu added to party Tyon Hood(pty:pla), Attorney Christine T. LeVu added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (jrm).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Responses due by 5/11/2021; Replies due by 5/18/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing is continued to 6/24/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Connie Lundgren)(Connaughton, E) (jrm).
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company of case(s) 3:21-cv-665-BEN-LL . (Pena, Evan) (jrm).
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gavin Ronan on behalf of Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez (Ronan, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Gavin Ronan added to party Tyon Hood(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Gavin Ronan added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (jrm).
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Herman on behalf of Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez (Herman, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman added to party Tyon Hood(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (jrm).
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aparajit Bhowmik on behalf of Tyon Hood, Drew Martinez (Bhowmik, Aparajit)Attorney Aparajit Bhowmik added to party Tyon Hood(pty:pla), Attorney Aparajit Bhowmik added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (jrm).
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (smd)(jms).
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration Part 1 - In Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration Part 2)(smd) (jms).
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15624873.), filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)The new case number is 3:21-cv-663-AJB-LL. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(smd)(jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: E Joseph Connaughton, III
Represented By: Evan Pena
Represented By: Kelly E. Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does l through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Martinez
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Andrew Gavin Ronan
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Herman
Represented By: Christine T. LeVu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyon Hood
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Andrew Gavin Ronan
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Herman
Represented By: Christine T. LeVu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?