Martinez v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Company et al
Plaintiff: Drew Martinez
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 and National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00665
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0185
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Drew Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine T. LeVu)(LeVu, Christine) (jrm).
May 28, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Connaughton, E) (jrm).
May 24, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY - Other re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration)(Connaughton, E)(jrm).
May 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Motion Hearing is hereby continued to 8/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia to be held concurrently with the Motion to Remand. (no document attached) (sc)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Responses due by 5/28/2021; Replies due by 6/4/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Drew Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Drew Martinez's Motion to Remand Case to State Court)(Herman, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: The Court notes that Plaintiff's have filed an Amended Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 16). Defendant is granted leave to file their Reply by 5/24/2021. (no document attached) (sc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Consolidate filed by Drew Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine T. LeVu, #2 Request for Judicial Notice of Exhibits 1-3)(LeVu, Christine)
May 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Pena on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Pena, Evan)Attorney Evan Pena added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jrm).
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Kagan on behalf of National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Kagan, Kelly)Attorney Kelly E. Kagan added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft) (jrm).
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Consolidate filed by Drew Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE T. LEVU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, #2 Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, #3 PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, #4 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)(LeVu, Christine) QC Mailer sent re incorrectly attached proposed order(jrm).
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Continued Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Motion Hearing continued to 7/29/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine T. LeVu on behalf of Drew Martinez (LeVu, Christine)Attorney Christine T. LeVu added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (jrm).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Responses due by 5/12/2021; Replies due by 5/19/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. Judge Roger T. Benitez no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:21-cv-00663-AJB-LL. The new case number is 21cv0665-AJB-LL. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/22/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/22/2021.(mme)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Connie Lundgren)(Connaughton, E)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company of case(s) 3:21-cv-663-AJB-LL . (Pena, Evan) (mme).
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gavin Ronan on behalf of Drew Martinez (Ronan, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Gavin Ronan added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (mme).
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Herman on behalf of Drew Martinez (Herman, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (mme).
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aparajit Bhowmik on behalf of Drew Martinez (Bhowmik, Aparajit)Attorney Aparajit Bhowmik added to party Drew Martinez(pty:pla) (mme).
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (smd) (jms).
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration Part 1 - In Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration Part 2)(smd) (jms).
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15625781.), filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)The new case number is 3:21-cv-665-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(smd) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: E Joseph Connaughton, III
Represented By: Evan Pena
Represented By: Kelly E. Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Martinez
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Andrew Gavin Ronan
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Herman
Represented By: Christine T. LeVu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?