(PC) Miranda v. Falcon et al
Plaintiff: Javier Miranda
Defendant: A. Cuevas and R. Falcon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00795
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of California.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached)(jms)(jrd)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from the Eastern District of California; Case Number 2:21-cv-00686-KJN. Original file received electronically.
April 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Javier Miranda. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/20/2021 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California.(Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 20, 2021 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Javier Miranda, CDCR# P-41638 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 16, 2021 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Javier Miranda. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/6/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Javier Miranda. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Javier Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Miranda v. Falcon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?