Hernandez v. Parker Hannifin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Yadira Hernandez
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 3:2021cv00808
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Childs, Tracie) (jmr).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/14/2021 at 2:00pm. Joint Discovery Plan due 6/30/2021. Signed Magistrate by Bernard G. Skomal on 5/04/2021.(jpp)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Parker Hannifin Corporation (Childs, Tracie) (jmr).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Parker Hannifin Corporation. No Parties With Financial Interest. (zda) (jms).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (zda) (jms).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15655339.), filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Tracie Childs in Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tracie Childs, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Tracie Childs, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Tracie Childs, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Tracie Childs)The new case number is 3:21-cv-808-H-BGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(zda) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Parker Hannifin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Tracie Lynn Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Hernandez
Represented By: Omid Nosrati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?