Taction Technology, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Counter Defendant: Taction Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00812
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: William V Gallo
3 Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 pt Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STATUS REPORT Regarding Stay by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Pak, Sean) (fth).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #44 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/16/2022. (sjt)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: In light of the stay, the Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for 3/16/2022 is hereby VACATED. (lkg)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Compel filed by Apple Inc. (fth) (filed publicly per #92 Minute Order) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2022 per Chambers request: #1 Declaration and Exhibits (ECF No. #88 ) (fth).
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER granting in part #86 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The unredacted version of Defendant's reply shall be filed on the public docket. Exhibits C and E attached to the Declaration of Jacqueline Tio in Support of Defendant's Reply shall be filed UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/11/2022. (fth)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference re #86 held on 3/11/2022. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas D. Pease; Gavin Snyder) (Defendant Attorney Jacqueline Tio; Christopher Marchese; Eda Stark) (no document attached) (lkg)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The Court hereby SETS a telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference regarding Defendant's unopposed Motion to File Documents Under Seal (ECF No. #86 ) for 3/11/2022, at 11:00 AM, before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the conference, all participating counsel should use the Court's conference line: (877) 873-8018; Access code: 9930765. (lkg)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DECLARATION re #85 Order on Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Taction Technology, Inc.. (Pak, Sean) (fth).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY - Other re #52 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacqueline Tio, #2 Exhibit C [Redacted], #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E [Redacted])(Tio, Jacqueline) (fth).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #86 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Tio, Jacqueline) (anh).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Tio, Jacqueline) (anh).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER granting #45 Motion to Compel. Signed by the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (fth)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Motion Hearing held by video on 2/22/2022 re #44 Defendant's MOTION to Compel and #45 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel. Orders to follow. (CD# 2/22/2022 JLB22-11:04-11:55) (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas D. Pease; Gavin Snyder; Jonathan Tse) (Defendant Attorney Seth Sproul; Jacqueline Tio; Christopher Marchese) (no document attached) (lkg)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying #82 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 2/9/2022. (fth)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Taction's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Source Code (Dkt. No. 45) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacqueline Tio, #2 Exhibit A - Apple's Sur-Reply to Taction's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Source Code, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Marchese, Christopher) (fth).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the video Motion Hearing on the parties' Motions to Compel (ECF Nos. #44 ; #45 ) currently scheduled for 2/15/2022 is hereby RESET to 2/22/2022, at 11:00 AM, before Judge Burkhardt. Participants shall refer to the Court's 2/1/2022 Order (ECF No. #80 ) for further directions and the relevant ZoomGov Meeting information. (lkg)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Setting Motion Hearing and Providing Zoom Information (ECF Nos. #44 , #45 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 2/1/2022. (fth)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Snyder Declaration)(Pak, Sean) (fth).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE Joint Statement Regarding Special Master by Taction Technology, Inc. re #71 Order,,, (Pak, Sean) (fth).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER denying #75 Motion for Leave to File. On January 26, 2022, the Court granted Defendants Motion to Stay in part (ECF No. #76 ). In light of the Order this Motion is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile if appropriate within seven (7) days of the PTAB's decision whether to institute IPR. It is further ordered that the parties' pending discovery disputes (ECF Nos. #44 ; #45 ) remain unaffected by the stay. Accordingly, the parties shall comply with all current deadlines in Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt's recent orders (ECF Nos. #70 ; #71 ). (no document attached) (err)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #53 Motion to Stay. The Parties SHALL FILE a joint status report within seven (7) days of the PTAB issuing its decision whether to institute IPR. Additionally, the Court GRANTS the request to stay the Claim Construction hearing currently set for February 18, 2022. The Court therefore STAYS the Parties remaining claim construction briefing and VACATES the February 18, 2022 hearing, with the briefing schedule and hearing to be reset once this stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/26/2022. (fth)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Response to January 19, 2022 Stay Hearing by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Brief in Response to January 19, 2022 Stay Hearing, #2 Declaration of Gavin Snyder, #3 Exhibit 1 - Hearing Transcript)(Pak, Sean)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion to Stay) held on 1/19/2022 before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/11/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2022. (akr)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Snyder Declaration, #2 Ex. 1 - Oliver Declaration, #3 Ex. 2 - Oliver CV, #4 Ex. 3 - Henriksen Declaration, #5 Ex. 4 - Henriksen CV, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8, #10 Ex. 9, #11 Ex. 10, #12 Ex. 11, #13 Ex. 12, #14 Ex. 13, #15 Ex. 14, #16 Ex. 15, #17 Ex. 16, #18 Ex. 17, #19 Ex. 18, #20 Ex. 19, #21 Ex. 20, #22 Ex. 21, #23 Ex. 22, #24 Ex. 23, #25 Ex. 24, #26 Ex. 25, #27 Ex. 26, #28 Ex. 27, #29 Ex. 28, #30 Ex. 29, #31 Ex. 30)(Pak, Sean) (fth).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Vincent Hayward, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD)(Sproul, Seth) (fth).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiff Taction Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Source Code (ECF No. #45 ) and related briefing, the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to file a reply to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition (ECF No. #49 ) by 5:00 PM on January 31, 2022. In addition to responding to Defendant's arguments, the reply should address whether Defendant has produced the source code it agreed to produce, whether the source code produced has been analyzed, and whether and to what extent the remaining requested code should nonetheless be ordered to be produced. Also by January 31, 2022, at 5:00 PM, the parties shall file a joint statement addressing whether the Court should appoint a special master pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53 with respect to the pending discovery dispute. Signed by the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/21/2022.(fth)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF PRIVILEGE LOG AND SUBMISSION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW [RE: ECF No. #44 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/21/2022. (fth)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Todd W. Robinson: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2022 re #53 MOTION to Stay filed by Apple Inc. The motion is taken under submission; written order to follow. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Scott Cole, Gavin Snyder (t), Jonathan Tse (t)). (Defendant Attorney Seth Sproul (t), Eda Stark (t)). (no document attached) (jao)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/18/2022. (fth)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance of Jonathan Tse by Jonathan S. Tse on behalf of Taction Technology, Inc. (Tse, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan S. Tse added to party Taction Technology, Inc.(pty:pla) (fth).
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Conduct Hearing Remotely (Unopposed) re #53 MOTION to Stay by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Pak, Sean) (fth).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY - Other re #62 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Apple Inc.. (Marchese, Christopher)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Linda Lopez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned back to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv812 TWR (JLB).(no document attached) (jcj)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Todd W. Robinson (TWR) to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez (LL). All pending dates - whether before Judge Robinson or any magistrate judge - remain unchanged. The new case number is 21cv812 LL (JLB). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 01/04/2022.(jcj)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Stay filed by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Pak, Sean) (fth).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Thornburgh on behalf of Apple Inc. (Thornburgh, John)Attorney John W Thornburgh added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (fth).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PRO HAC APPROVED: Eda Stark appearing for Defendant Apple Inc., Counter Claimant Apple Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16389479.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Stark, Eda) (rmc).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Chart, #2 Joint Claim Construction Worksheet)(Pak, Sean) (fth).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal (ECF No. #50 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 11/23/21. (jmo)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (ESI). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 11/12/2021. (fth)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) for Approval of Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Electronically-Stored Information by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pak, Sean) (fth).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joy B. Kete, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Marchese, Christopher) (fth).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Compel (Redacted) filed by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin Snyder, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Redacted))(Pak, Sean)(sxa).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #50 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Pak, Sean) (jmo).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Pak, Sean) (jmo).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacqueline Tio, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Tio, Jacqueline) (fth).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 21cv0812-TWR-JLB.(no document attached) (dlg)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting Motion to Seal #42 . Signed by District Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/29/21. (jmo)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Snyder Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Pak, Sean) (dlg).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Compel by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacqueline Tio, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Redacted))(Tio, Jacqueline) (dlg).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 **Docketed Under Seal as 47 per Order #46 ** [SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #42 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Tio, Jacqueline) (jmo). Modified on 9/29/2021 to seal per order (jmo).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Tio, Jacqueline) (jmo).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/13/21.(dlg)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jacqueline Tio appearing for Defendant Apple Inc., Counter Claimant Apple Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16124915.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Tio, Jacqueline) (rmc).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule : Each party shall file a motion to compel on or before September 27, 2021. Each party shall file an opposition on or before October 11, 2021. No replies shall be filed unless otherwise ordered by the Court.(dlg)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Joint #36 Motion for Protective Order; and Entering Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/13/21. (dlg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Taction Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Pak, Sean) (dlg).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF Nos. #18 ; 23: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/20/2021 by video conference. The case did not settle. (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Pease; Scott Cole; Gavin Snyder) (Defendant Attorney Christopher Marchese; Seth Sproul; Joy Kete) (John Steinberg; James Wiley, Jr.; Benjamin Huh) (no document attached) (mjg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction and Tutorial Hearing set for 2/18/2022 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/16/2022 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/10/21.(dlg)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF Nos. #18 ; 23: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2021. Scheduling Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Scott L. Cole; Thomas D. Pease; Gavin K. Snyder) (Defendant Attorney Seth M. Sproul; Christopher S. Marchese; Joy B. Kete) (Ben Huh) (no document attached) (mjg)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Taction Technology, Inc. (Pak, Sean) (zda).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRO HAC APPROVED: Joy Backer Kete appearing for Defendant Apple Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRO HAC APPROVED: Laura Elizabeth Powell appearing for Defendant Apple Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kete, Joy) (dsn)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Powell, Laura) (dsn)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15972500.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kete, Joy) QC email sent re missing signature. (dsn)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15972422.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Powell, Laura) QC email sent re missing signature. (dsn)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Scott L. Cole, re #10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/21/2021.(rmc)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Taction Technology, Inc..(Pak, Sean) (dlg).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conferences (ECF No. #19 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court hereby orders as follows: The 8/5/2021 video Case Management Conference ("CMC") is CONVERTED to a telephonic, counsel-only CMC and CONTINUED to 8/9/2021, at 11:00 AM before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the CMC, all participating counsel shall call the Court's teleconference line at 877-873-8018 and use access code 9930765. The 8/5/2021 video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") is CONTINUED to 8/20/2021, at 9:00 AM before Judge Burkhardt and remains set as a video conference. The 7/26/2021 deadline to file a Joint Discovery Plan is EXTENDED to 7/30/2021. The 7/26/2021 deadline to lodge ENE statements is EXTENDED to 8/10/2021. This Order does not otherwise alter the mandatory directions, dates, and deadlines set forth in the Court's 6/23/2021 Order (ECF No. #18 ). (no document attached) (mjg) Modified on 7/7/2021 to add docket text and regenerate nef per mj chambers (dlg).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Thomas D. Pease, re #21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/6/2021.(rmc)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pease, Thomas) (rmc).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Cole, Scott) QC mail sent re duplicate filing of #10 (rmc).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Apple Inc.. (Marchese, Christopher) (dlg).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/5/2021 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/23/21.(dlg)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Taction Technology, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Marchese, Christopher) (dlg).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Apple Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Sproul, Seth) (dlg).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Joint #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to June 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/21. (dlg)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Sproul, Seth)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth M Sproul on behalf of Apple Inc. (Sproul, Seth)Attorney Seth M Sproul added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Marchese on behalf of Apple Inc. (Marchese, Christopher)Attorney Christopher Scott Marchese added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15699613.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pease, Thomas) QC mail sent on 5/6/2021 re incomplete document, instructed to re-file (rmc).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15690524.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Cole, Scott) (rmc).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Kenneth Snyder on behalf of Taction Technology, Inc. (Snyder, Gavin)Attorney Gavin Kenneth Snyder added to party Taction Technology, Inc.(pty:pla) (jmo).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Cole, Scott) QC mail sent re missing fee (rmc).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv812 GPC (JLB).(no document attached) (jcj)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taction Technology, Inc.. Apple Inc. served. (Pak, Sean) (dlg).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv812-GPC-WVG.(no document attached) (zda)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taction Technology, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Pak, Sean) (dlg).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda) (jms).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *10,659,885*, *10,820,117*, *10,237,660*, *2016/0086458*, *9,439,921*, *10,237,660* cc:USPTO (zda)(jms).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15659126.), filed by Taction Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - US10659885, #3 Exhibit B - US10820117, #4 Exhibit C - Haptics Firmware Engineer, #5 Exhibit D - Haptics Quality Engineer, #6 Exhibit D - Haptics Product Design Engineer)The new case number is 3:21-cv-812-GPC-MSB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Pak, Sean)(zda) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taction Technology, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: Christopher Scott Marchese
Represented By: Jacqueline Tio
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: John W Thornburgh
Represented By: Joy Backer Kete
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Taction Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Sean S. Pak
Represented By: Gavin Kenneth Snyder
Represented By: Scott L. Cole
Represented By: Thomas D. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?