Mapes et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Mapes and Gordon Mapes
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00870
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand to State Court (Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service.). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/12/2021. (jpp) (dlg).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 5/31/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/20/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/07/2021.(jpp)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 7/12/2021 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY - Other re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego filed by Alicia Mapes, Gordon Mapes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand)(Law, Daniel)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Lotardo on behalf of Alicia Mapes, Gordon Mapes (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Lotardo, Regina)Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Alicia Mapes(pty:pla), Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Gordon Mapes(pty:pla) (jpp).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Case Management Conference held on 7/2/2021. (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Law). (Defendant Attorney Hailey Rogerson). (no document attached) (Dech, E.)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: The parties have not reached a settlement. The Settlement Conference on July 2, 2021 at 9 a.m. is converted to a telephonic Case Management Conference with counsel. Plaintiffs' counsel must arrange for counsel to call the Court's chambers on a shared line to participate.(no document attached) (kxb)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/28/2021. Parties must respond to mediator's proposal on or before 6/30/2021. A Settlement Conference is set for 7/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.(Plaintiff Attorney Christine Haw). (Defendant Attorney Hailey Carlson). (no document attached) (kxb)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney in support of Opp to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Atty Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Atty Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Atty Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Atty Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Atty Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Atty Declaration, #8 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (jpp).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance Of Counsel by Christine J. Haw on behalf of Alicia Mapes, Gordon Mapes (Haw, Christine)Attorney Christine J. Haw added to party Alicia Mapes(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J. Haw added to party Gordon Mapes(pty:pla) (jpp).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") is denied. Dkt. No. 11. Plaintiff has not complied with the Court's ENE Order requirements to provide ENE participant contact information or an ENE brief, although the deadline to do so passed on 6/21/2021. Plaintiff must fully comply with the ENE Order's requirements no later than 6/23/2021 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 6/22/2021. (no document attached) (kxb)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney iso Opposition to EPA, #2 Exhibit A to Hailey Rogerson Decl iso Opposition to EPA, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (jpp).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Alicia Mapes, Gordon Mapes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Law In Support of Ex Parte App., #2 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application)(Law, Daniel) (jpp).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Alicia Mapes, Gordon Mapes (Law, Daniel) (jpp).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego by Alicia Mapes, Gordon Mapes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Law, Daniel) (mme).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Daniel Law on behalf of Alicia Mapes, Gordon Mapes (Law, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Law added to party Alicia Mapes(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Law added to party Gordon Mapes(pty:pla) (mme).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. A video conference Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 6/28/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. If the case does not settle during the ENE the Court will immediately proceed with the Case Management Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 5/7/2021. (tcf)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg Gruzman on behalf of FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: attorney needs to update address in Pacer (tcf).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (tcf).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft) (tcf).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (fth) (dlg).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.) for FCA US LLC. (fth) (dlg).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15695453.), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hugret iso Removal, #3 Declaration of Hailey Rogerson iso Removal, #4 Exhibit A to HR Declaration iso Removal, #5 Exhibit B to HR Declaration iso Remova, #6 Exhibit C to HR Declaration iso Removal, #7 Exhibit D to HR Declaration iso Removal, #8 Exhibit E to HR Declaration iso Removal, #9 Exhibit F to HR Declaration iso Removal, #10 Exhibit G to HR Declaration iso Removal, #11 Exhibit H to HR Declaration iso Removal, #12 Exhibit I to HR Declaration iso Removal, #13 Exhibit J to HR Declaration iso Removal, #14 Exhibit K to HR Declaration iso Removal, #15 Exhibit L to HR Declaration iso Removal, #16 Exhibit M to HR Declaration iso Removal, #17 Exhibit N to HR Declaration iso Removal, #18 Exhibit O to HR Declaration iso Removal, #19 Exhibit P to HR Declaration iso Removal, #20 Exhibit Q to HR Declaration iso Removal, #21 Exhibit R to HR Declaration iso Removal, #22 Exhibit S to HR Declaration iso Removal, #23 Exhibit T to HR Declaration iso Removal, #24 Exhibit U to HR Declaration iso Removal, #25 Exhibit V to HR Declaration iso Removal, #26 Exhibit W to HR Declaration iso Removal, #27 Exhibit X to HR Declaration iso Removal, #28 Exhibit Y to HR Declaration iso Removal, #29 Exhibit Z to HR Declaration iso Removal, #30 Exhibit AA to HR Declaration iso Removal, #31 Exhibit BB to HR Declaration iso Removal, #32 Exhibit CC to HR Declaration iso Removal, #33 Exhibit DD to HR Declaration iso Removal, #34 Exhibit EE to HR Declaration iso Removal, #35 Exhibit FF to HR Declaration iso Removal, #36 Exhibit GG to HR Declaration iso Removal, #37 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:21-cv-870-BEN-DEB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (fth) (dlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mapes et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Mapes
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel Law
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Christine J. Haw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Mapes
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel Law
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Christine J. Haw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?