Novalk, LLC v. Sedgwick et al
Plaintiff: Novalk, LLC
Defendant: Jesus Montijo, Sedgwick and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2021cv00973
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 in
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 8/2/2021 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY - Other re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sedgwick. (Watnick, Kenneth) (jpp).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER following July 1, 2021 Show Cause Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/01/2021.(jpp)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/1/2021. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Kirk Rauch). (Defendant Attorney Kenneth D Watnick). CD No. LL21-10:02-10:07(no document attached) (fk1) Modified on 7/1/2021 (rla).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Novalk, LLC re #11 Order to Show Cause. (Rauch, Andrew) (jpp).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sedgwick. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Watnick, Kenneth) (jpp).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2021 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/25/2021.(jpp)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: (T)Status Conference held on 6/25/2021. Plaintff's attorney did not appear. Order to follow. (Defendant Attorney Kenneth D. Watnick). (no document attached) (fk1)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 6/25/2021 at 1:00pm. (jpp)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference for 6/25/2021 at 1:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/23/2021.(jpp)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend,, by Defendant Sedgwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kenneth D. Watnick, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kenneth D. Watnick)(Watnick, Kenneth) (jpp).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #5 Joint Motion (1) Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint and (2) To Extend Deadline for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. to File Responsive Pleading. The Court GRANTS the Joint Motion and instructs Plaintiff to file the First Amended Complaint on the docket by Monday, June 7, 2021. However, all doe defendants must be removed from the First Amended Complaint prior to filing it on the docket. Defendant must file a responsive pleading by Monday, June 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 05/28/2021. (mme)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and Deadline for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. to File Responsive Pleading by Sedgwick. (Watnick, Kenneth) (mme).
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv973 BEN (LL).(no document attached) (jcj)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendant Sedgwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Watnick, Kenneth) (mme).
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Sedgwick . Identifying Other Affiliate Evanston Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Markel Corporation for Sedgwick. (Watnick, Kenneth) (mme).
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15750707.), filed by Sedgwick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Case Management Conference, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Service of Process, #6 Exhibit E - Corporation Statement of Information)The new case number is 3:21-cv-973-W-LL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (fth) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novalk, LLC v. Sedgwick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novalk, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kirk Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Montijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick
Represented By: Kenneth D Watnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?