Pipich v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pipich
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01120
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 fl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re First Amended Complaint by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Paradis, Derek) (jpp).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sophia Marie Rios (Rios, Sophia) (jpp).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, filed by Jeffrey Pipich. (Rios, Sophia) (jpp).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Edwin Mendelson Boniske on behalf of O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Boniske, Edwin)Attorney Edwin Mendelson Boniske added to party O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by James M Peterson on behalf of O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Peterson, James)Attorney James M Peterson added to party O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Paradis, Derek)Attorney Derek W. Paradis added to party O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Pipich. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC served. (Fundora Rodriguez, Camille) (jpp).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC APPROVED: Shanon Jude Carson appearing for Plaintiff Jeffrey Pipich. (no document attached) (jrd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $213.00 receipt number ACASDC-15835783.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Carson, Shanon)(jrd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC APPROVED: Camille Fundora Rodriguez appearing for Plaintiff Jeffrey Pipich. (no document attached) (jrd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC APPROVED: Daniel Frederick Thornton appearing for Plaintiff Jeffrey Pipich.(no document attached) (jrd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $213.00 receipt number ACASDC-15835498.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Fundora Rodriguez, Camille)(jrd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $213.00 receipt number ACASDC-15835429.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Thornton, Daniel)(jrd)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (rmc).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15834620.), filed by Jeffrey Pipich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1120-L-LL. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Rios, Sophia) (fth) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pipich v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: James M Peterson
Represented By: Derek W. Paradis
Represented By: Edwin Mendelson Boniske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pipich
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Daniel Frederick Thornton
Represented By: Sophia Marie Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?