Randall v. Saul
Plaintiff: Donnell Randall
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv01189
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donnell Randall. All Defendants served. (Sangimino, Kaylin) (tcf).
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned in the presiding role. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1189-JLS-MDD.(no document attached) (sjt)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Deane on behalf of Donnell Randall (Deane, Dana)Attorney Dana Deane added to party Donnell Randall(pty:pla) (jpp).
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/30/2021. (jpp)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Mitchell D. Dembin has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent / declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice.(dxf)(jrd)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donnell Randall. (Attachments: #1 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Declaration Networth and Fee Assignment Declaration)(dxf)(jrd)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Andrew Saul, IFP Filed, filed by Donnell Randall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1189-MDD. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is assigned to the case. (Sangimino, Kaylin)(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Randall
Represented By: Kaylin Ashley Sangimino
Represented By: Dana Deane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?