Abarr et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Richard Caton, Juan Estrada, Anthony Hollingsworth, Christal Ayala, Douglas Beckham, Johnny Harper, Paul Abarr, Moaney Ray, James Bruno, Norman Walker, Peter Echeverria, Lucas Stephens, Marley Espalin, Barton Gonzalez, Jonathan Sparks, Andrea Quesada, Jeffrey Guadalajara, James Brooks, Sharonna Hutchins, Tonya Lind, Vanessa Arrey, Quoc Huynh, Tasha Trammel, Michael Schmidt, Jimmy Tressler, Kaytricia Hayden, Dean Bommel, Phillip Chavez, Jessica Simpson, Angelica Gutierrez, Ruben Hernandez, Jordan Aders, Lester Johnson, Paul Perez, Ismael Pena, Jr, Christopher Zettlemoyer, Celina Back, Matthew Yeats, Melissa Serrato, Mark Barnette, Deandre Knight, Markee Harris, Danela Martinez, Rhonda Ritchey, Laquitta George, Vanessa Hernandez, Crystal Horath, Ann Perez, Willie Williams, Erick Kessler, Selena Delgado, Monica Garcia, Michelle Taylor, Ronnie Hernandez, Janette Mouck, Lainie Ann Graham, Travis Middleton, Shreel Jackson, Timothy Deasy, Kobe Abbott, Crystal Stidham, Tonya Taylor, Elizabeth Giddens, Linda Edwards, Amber Bennett, Randle Posten, Samuel De Los Angeles, Sr., Leanna Willis, Stone Blacksands, Marcus De Hoyos, Crystal Gutierrez, Vannessa Pitts, Terrell Johnson, Olivia Kelly, Brenda Mccann, Israel Rivera, Anthony Jeff, Sky Beehler, Sabrina Laxton, Latasha Williamson, Susan Chapple, Nickolaus Dirickson, Christina Mccafferty, Juan Valenzuela, John Idemudia, Lyndsey Gutcher, Maritza Escalante, Victoria Jones, Kayli Duey, David Vasquez, Benjamin Douglass, Colton Wood, Latisha Gage, Shant Hakopian, Zacharia Williams, Victor Cardenas Cortez, Cody Ferraro, Tiffany Cochran, Heather Morris, Jason Wallace, Kelly Owen, David Anderson, Cameren Wilburn, Teresa Dagostino Criado, Lindsie Holloway, Joshua Pummill, Rebekah Anderson, Glen Young, Joseph Calzado, Delbert Delgado, Daniel Byrn, Nicole Smith, Corey Lawson, Joseph Main, Jason Turnbull, Anthony Douglas, Audrey Grant, Amanda Andrade, Raylene Salaz, Jenna Silva, Abigail Galicia, Evett Johnson, Jose Contreras, Stephanie Flores, Angela Chavez, Thomas Turner, Manuel Villagomez, Joseph Magallan, Reina Valadez, Joe Robles, Cesar Tamayo, Limmie Littles, Carmen Robinson, Vernon Matthews, Jonathan Aguirre, Ronda Lopez, Maurilio Quiroz, Flouzel Paningbatan, Christopher Allison, Lelanya Ojeda, Meredith Friday, Frankie Saldate, Randy Chase, Derrick Jabara, Mykela Raiff, Lorina Dones, Luis Delariva, Sean Grimes, Timothy Schmitz, Jennifer Contreras, Dwight Burrow, Janelle Maurer, Tina Pomeroy, James Hanes, Mario Bynum, Micah Haney, Linda Miller, Forrest Berlt, Sarah Murphy, Anthony Franks, Robert Murphy, Joseph Friend, Terrence Wilkins, Lavell Moore, Glynda Gaynor, Roxanne Eason, Catrina Rodriguez, Andres Gutierrez, Jose Rodriguez Romo, Heather Dale, Darnell Pitts, Sara Morales, Lacey Wise, Terrance Howze, Denise Wilds, Beth Burns, Robert Jaurigue Jr., Lamar Collins, Angela Gonzalez, Jacob Flores, Nicholas Brady, Donmonique Corella, Melanie Piette, Misty Pointer, Kimberly Carpenter, Dawn Farina, Arminda Sevilla, Noah Guirguis, Stacey Camberos, Patricia Castillo, Amy Stanfill, Nicholas Tonna, Ivan Harris, Courtney Alvarez, Miguel Salazar, Kenyon Perkins, Ryan Pita, Preston Hanna, Sheila Anistik, Melissa Royston, Mark Owensby, Gretchen Heinz, Kawana Reed, Michell De Vera, Michael Mccrary, Miguel Roa, Juanita Isles, Raina Madrid, Seante Glassflowers, Robert Arnoldstarr, Ernie Loredo, Mario Madrid, Albert Morales, Arnold Flores, Frank Ortiz, Jr, Michael Sims, II, Crystal Cortez-Gonzalez, Luis Viramontes, Denise Smith, Russell Matson, Jr, Brian Jones, Nehemiah Rima-Fleurima, Rebecca Harden, Bahram Hassanshahi, Willie Gray, Tyrisha Williams, Kevin Alvarez, Kimberly Nicholson, Sharise Morgan and Lizet Gonzalez
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01203
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Larry Alan Burns
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693 ef
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul Abarr, as to Bank of America, N.A.. (Swigart, Joshua) QC Mailer, re: caption(jmr).
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Paul Abarr, Kobe Abbott, Jordan Aders, Jonathan Aguirre, Christopher Allison, Courtney Alvarez, Kevin Alvarez, David Anderson, Rebekah Anderson, Amanda Andrade, Sheila Anistik, Robert Arnoldstarr, Vanessa Arrey, Christal Ayala, Celina Back, Mark Barnette, Douglas Beckham, Sky Beehler, Amber Bennett, Forrest Berlt, Stone Blacksands, Dean Bommel, Nicholas Brady, James Brooks, James Bruno, Beth Burns, Dwight Burrow, Mario Bynum, Daniel Byrn, Joseph Calzado, Stacey Camberos, Victor Cardenas Cortez, Kimberly Carpenter, Patricia Castillo, Richard Caton, Susan Chapple, Randy Chase, Angela Chavez, Phillip Chavez, Tiffany Cochran, Lamar Collins, Jennifer Contreras, Jose Contreras, Donmonique Corella, Crystal Cortez-Gonzalez, Teresa Dagostino Criado, Heather Dale, Marcus De Hoyos, Samuel De Los Angeles, Sr, Michell De Vera, Timothy Deasy, Luis Delariva, Delbert Delgado, Selena Delgado, Nickolaus Dirickson, Lorina Dones, Anthony Douglas, Benjamin Douglass, Kayli Duey, Roxanne Eason, Peter Echeverria, Linda Edwards, Maritza Escalante, Marley Espalin, Juan Estrada, Dawn Farina, Cody Ferraro, Arnold Flores, Jacob Flores, Stephanie Flores, Anthony Franks, Meredith Friday, Joseph Friend, Latisha Gage, Abigail Galicia, Monica Garcia, Glynda Gaynor, Laquitta George, Elizabeth Giddens, Seante Glassflowers, Angela Gonzalez, Barton Gonzalez, Lizet Gonzalez, Lainie Ann Graham, Audrey Grant, Willie Gray, Sean Grimes, Jeffrey Guadalajara, Noah Guirguis, Lyndsey Gutcher, Andres Gutierrez, Angelica Gutierrez, Crystal Gutierrez, Shant Hakopian, James Hanes, Micah Haney, Preston Hanna, Rebecca Harden, Johnny Harper, Ivan Harris, Markee Harris, Bahram Hassanshahi, Kaytricia Hayden, Gretchen Heinz, Ronnie Hernandez, Ruben Hernandez, Vanessa Hernandez, Anthony Hollingsworth, Lindsie Holloway, Crystal Horath, Terrance Howze, Sharonna Hutchins, Quoc Huynh, John Idemudia, Juanita Isles, Derrick Jabara, Shreel Jackson, Robert Jaurigue Jr., Anthony Jeff, Evett Johnson, Lester Johnson, Terrell Johnson, Brian Jones, Victoria Jones, Olivia Kelly, Erick Kessler, Deandre Knight, Corey Lawson, Sabrina Laxton, Tonya Lind, Limmie Littles, Ronda Lopez, Ernie Loredo, Mario Madrid, Raina Madrid, Joseph Magallan, Joseph Main, Danela Martinez, Russell Matson, Jr, Vernon Matthews, Janelle Maurer, Christina Mccafferty, Brenda Mccann, Michael Mccrary, Travis Middleton, Linda Miller, Lavell Moore, Albert Morales, Sara Morales, Sharise Morgan, Heather Morris, Janette Mouck, Robert Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Kimberly Nicholson, Lelanya Ojeda, Frank Ortiz, Jr, Kelly Owen, Mark Owensby, Flouzel Paningbatan, Ismael Pena, Jr, Ann Perez, Paul Perez, Kenyon Perkins, Melanie Piette, Ryan Pita, Darnell Pitts, Vannessa Pitts, Misty Pointer, Tina Pomeroy, Randle Posten, Joshua Pummill, Andrea Quesada, Maurilio Quiroz, Mykela Raiff, Moaney Ray, Kawana Reed, Nehemiah Rima-Fleurima, Rhonda Ritchey, Israel Rivera, Miguel Roa, Carmen Robinson, Joe Robles, Catrina Rodriguez, Jose Rodriguez Romo, Melissa Royston, Raylene Salaz, Miguel Salazar, Frankie Saldate, Michael Schmidt, Timothy Schmitz, Melissa Serrato, Arminda Sevilla, Jenna Silva, Jessica Simpson, Michael Sims, II, Denise Smith, Nicole Smith, Jonathan Sparks, Amy Stanfill, Lucas Stephens, Crystal Stidham, Cesar Tamayo, Michelle Taylor, Tonya Taylor, Nicholas Tonna, Tasha Trammel, Jimmy Tressler, Jason Turnbull, Thomas Turner, Reina Valadez, Juan Valenzuela, David Vasquez, Manuel Villagomez, Luis Viramontes, Norman Walker, Jason Wallace, Cameren Wilburn, Denise Wilds, Terrence Wilkins, Tyrisha Williams, Willie Williams, Zacharia Williams, Latasha Williamson, Leanna Willis, Lacey Wise, Colton Wood, Matthew Yeats, Glen Young, Christopher Zettlemoyer (Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Paul Abarr(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Kobe Abbott(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Jordan Aders(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Jonathan Aguirre(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Christopher Allison(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Courtney Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Kevin Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party David Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Rebekah Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Amanda Andrade(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Sheila Anistik(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Robert Arnoldstarr(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Vanessa Arrey(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Christal Ayala(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Celina Back(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Mark Barnette(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Douglas Beckham(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Sky Beehler(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Amber Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Forrest Berlt(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Stone Blacksands(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Dean Bommel(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Nicholas Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party James Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party James Bruno(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Beth Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Dwight Burrow(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Mario Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Daniel Byrn(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Joseph Calzado(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Stacey Camberos(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Victor Cardenas Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Kimberly Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Patricia Castillo(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Richard Caton(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Susan Chapple(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Randy Chase(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Angela Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Phillip Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Tiffany Cochran(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Lamar Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Jennifer Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Jose Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Donmonique Corella(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Crystal Cortez-Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Teresa Dagostino Criado(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Heather Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Marcus De Hoyos(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Samuel De Los Angeles, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Michell De Vera(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Timothy Deasy(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Luis Delariva(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Delbert Delgado(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Selena Delgado(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Nickolaus Dirickson(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Lorina Dones(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Anthony Douglas(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Benjamin Douglass(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Kayli Duey(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Roxanne Eason(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Peter Echeverria(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Linda Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Maritza Escalante(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Marley Espalin(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Juan Estrada(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Dawn Farina(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Cody Ferraro(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Arnold Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Jacob Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Stephanie Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Anthony Franks(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Meredith Friday(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Joseph Friend(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Latisha Gage(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Abigail Galicia(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Glynda Gaynor(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Laquitta George(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Elizabeth Giddens(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Seante Glassflowers(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Angela Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Barton Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Lizet Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Lainie Ann Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Audrey Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Willie Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Sean Grimes(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Jeffrey Guadalajara(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Noah Guirguis(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Lyndsey Gutcher(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Andres Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Angelica Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Crystal Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Shant Hakopian(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party James Hanes(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Micah Haney(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Preston Hanna(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Rebecca Harden(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Johnny Harper(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Ivan Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Markee H
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas J. Whelan, Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:21-md-02992-LAB-MSB. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01203-LAB-MSB. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/7/2021. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/7/2021.(jrm)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Joshua B. Swigart by Joshua Brandon Swigart on behalf of Paul Abarr (Swigart, Joshua)(jrm).
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Paul Abarr of case(s) 21-md-02992 . (Swigart, Joshua) (jpp).
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1203-W-AGS.(no document attached) (fth)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dxf)(jrd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Bank of America, N.A. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15885477.), filed by Paul Abarr, Kobe Abbott, Jordan Aders, Jonathan Aguirre, Christopher Allison, Kevin Alvarez, Courtney Alvarez, David Anderson, Rebekah Anderson, Amanda Andrade, Samuel De Los Angeles, Sr., Sheila Anistik, Robert Arnoldstarr, Vanessa Arrey, Christal Ayala, Celina Back, Mark Barnette, Douglas Beckham, Sky Beehler, Amber Bennett, Forrest Berlt, Stone Blacksands, Dean Bommel, Nicholas Brady, James Brooks, James Bruno, Beth Burns, Dwight Burrow, Mario Bynum, Daniel Byrn, Joseph Calzado, Stacey Camberos, Kimberly Carpenter, Patricia Castillo, Richard Caton, Susan Chapple, Randy Chase, Angela Chavez, Phillip Chavez, Tiffany Cochran, Lamar Collins, Jennifer Contreras, Jose Contreras, Donmonique Corella, Victor Cardenas Cortez, Crystal Cortez-Gonzalez, Teresa Dagostino Criado, Heather Dale, Timothy Deasy, Luis Delariva, Delbert Delgado, Selena Delgado, Nickolaus Dirickson, Lorina Dones, Anthony Douglas, Benjamin Douglass, Kayli Duey, Roxanne Eason, Jacob Flores, Arnold Flores, Stephanie Flores, Anthony Franks, Meredith Friday, Joseph Friend, Abigail Galicia, Latisha Gage, Monica Garcia, Glynda Gaynor, Laquitta George, Elizabeth Giddens, Seante Glassflowers, Angela Gonzalez, Barton Gonzalez, Lizet Gonzalez, Lainie Ann Graham, Audrey Grant, Willie Gray, Sean Grimes, Jeffrey Guadalajara, Noah Guirguis, Lyndsey Gutcher, Andres Gutierrez, Angelica Gutierrez, Crystal Gutierrez, Shant Hakopian, James Hanes, Micah Haney, Anthony Hollingsworth, Lindsie Holloway, Crystal Horath, Terrance Howze, Marcus De Hoyos, Sharonna Hutchins, Quoc Huynh, John Idemudia, Juanita Isles, Derrick Jabara, Shreel Jackson, Robert Jaurigue Jr., Anthony Jeff, Evett Johnson, Lester Johnson, Terrell Johnson, Brian Jones, Victoria Jones, Olivia Kelly, Erick Kessler, Deandre Knight, Corey Lawson, Sabrina Laxton, Tonya Lind, Lavell Moore, Sara Morales, Albert Morales, Sharise Morgan, Heather Morris, Janette Mouck, Robert Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Kimberly Nicholson, Lelanya Ojeda, Frank Ortiz Jr., Kelly Owen, Mark Owensby, Flouzel Paningbatan, Ismael Pena, Jr., Ann Perez, Paul Perez, Kenyon Perkins, Melanie Piette, Ryan Pita, Raylene Salaz, Miguel Salazar, Frankie Saldate, Michael Schmidt, Timothy Schmitz, Melissa Serrato, Arminda Sevilla, Jenna Silva, Jessica Simpson, Michael Sims Ii, Denise Smith, Nicole Smith, Jonathan Sparks, Amy Stanfill, Lucas Stephens, Crystal Stidham, Cesar Tamayo, Lacey Wise, Colton Wood, Matthew Yeats, Glen Young, Christopher Zettlemoyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1203-BEN-AGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abarr et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Caton
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Estrada
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hollingsworth
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christal Ayala
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Beckham
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Harper
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Abarr
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moaney Ray
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bruno
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Walker
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Echeverria
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Stephens
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marley Espalin
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barton Gonzalez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Sparks
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Quesada
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Guadalajara
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brooks
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharonna Hutchins
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Lind
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Arrey
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quoc Huynh
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Trammel
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schmidt
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Tressler
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaytricia Hayden
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Bommel
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Chavez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Simpson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Gutierrez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Hernandez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Aders
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Perez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Pena, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Zettlemoyer
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celina Back
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Yeats
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Serrato
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Barnette
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Knight
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markee Harris
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danela Martinez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Ritchey
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquitta George
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Hernandez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Horath
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Perez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Williams
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Kessler
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Delgado
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Garcia
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Taylor
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Hernandez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Mouck
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lainie Ann Graham
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Middleton
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shreel Jackson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Deasy
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kobe Abbott
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Stidham
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Taylor
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Giddens
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Edwards
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Bennett
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randle Posten
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel De Los Angeles, Sr.
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Willis
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Blacksands
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus De Hoyos
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Gutierrez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vannessa Pitts
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Kelly
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Mccann
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Rivera
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jeff
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Beehler
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Laxton
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Williamson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Chapple
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickolaus Dirickson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Mccafferty
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Valenzuela
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Idemudia
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndsey Gutcher
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Escalante
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Jones
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayli Duey
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vasquez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Douglass
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton Wood
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Gage
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shant Hakopian
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zacharia Williams
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Cardenas Cortez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Ferraro
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Cochran
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Morris
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wallace
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Owen
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Anderson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameren Wilburn
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Dagostino Criado
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsie Holloway
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Pummill
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Anderson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Young
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Calzado
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Delgado
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Byrn
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Smith
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Lawson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Main
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Turnbull
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Douglas
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Grant
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Andrade
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raylene Salaz
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Silva
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Galicia
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evett Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Contreras
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Flores
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Chavez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Turner
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Villagomez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Magallan
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reina Valadez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Robles
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Tamayo
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limmie Littles
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Robinson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Matthews
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Aguirre
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Lopez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurilio Quiroz
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flouzel Paningbatan
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allison
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lelanya Ojeda
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Friday
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Saldate
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Chase
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Jabara
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mykela Raiff
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorina Dones
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Delariva
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Grimes
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Schmitz
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Contreras
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Burrow
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Maurer
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Pomeroy
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hanes
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Bynum
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Haney
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Miller
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Berlt
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Murphy
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Franks
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Murphy
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Friend
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Wilkins
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavell Moore
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynda Gaynor
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Eason
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrina Rodriguez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Gutierrez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rodriguez Romo
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Dale
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Pitts
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Morales
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Wise
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Howze
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Wilds
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Burns
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jaurigue Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Collins
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Gonzalez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Flores
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Brady
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donmonique Corella
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Piette
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Pointer
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Carpenter
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Farina
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arminda Sevilla
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Guirguis
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Camberos
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Castillo
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Stanfill
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Tonna
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Harris
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Alvarez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Salazar
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyon Perkins
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Pita
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Hanna
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Anistik
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Royston
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Owensby
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Heinz
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawana Reed
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michell De Vera
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mccrary
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Roa
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Isles
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raina Madrid
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seante Glassflowers
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arnoldstarr
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Loredo
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Madrid
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Morales
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Flores
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ortiz, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sims, II
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Cortez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Viramontes
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Smith
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Matson, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jones
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Rima-Fleurima
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Harden
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahram Hassanshahi
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Gray
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrisha Williams
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Alvarez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Nicholson
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharise Morgan
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizet Gonzalez
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?