Law Office of Guy Levy, Inc. v. Moishes Moving Systems et al
Plaintiff: Law Office of Guy Levy, Inc.
Defendant: Moishes Moving Systems Of Chicago, LLC, Moishes Long Distance Dept., Moishes Mini-Storage, Maya Properties, LLC, Moishes Self Storage, Omega Moving & Storage, Inc., Moishes Moving Systems, LLC and Moishes Moving Systems
Case Number: 3:2021cv01212
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Joinder by Omega Moving & Storage, Inc. re #11 Reply to Response to Motion (Angert, Mark) (jpp).
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief may be granted filed by Moishes Moving Systems, LLC. (Garfinkel, Gregg) (jpp).
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief may be granted filed by Law Office of Guy Levy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support thereof)(Clune, John) (jpp).
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Andrew Kelly on behalf of Omega Moving & Storage, Inc. (Kelly, John)Attorney John Andrew Kelly added to party Omega Moving & Storage, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Angert on behalf of Omega Moving & Storage, Inc. (Angert, Mark)Attorney Mark Angert added to party Omega Moving & Storage, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Joinder by Omega Moving & Storage, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief may be granted (Angert, Mark) (jpp).
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief may be granted by Moishes Moving Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Notice of Motion to Dismiss due to failure to State a Claim upon which relief may be granted; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Garfinkel, Gregg) (jpp).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER vacating Order to remand #3 . Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/15/2021. (cc: Superior Court). (jpp)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Order Remanding Case by Moishes Moving Systems. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Garfinkel, Gregg)Attorney Gregg S. Garfinkel added to party Moishes Moving Systems(pty:dft)(jpp).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Remanding action to State Court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/09/2021. (cc: Superior Court)(jpp) (dlg).
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Moishes Moving Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Notice of Motion to Dismiss due to failure to State a Claim upon which relief may be granted; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Garfinkel, Gregg) (jpp).
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15891194.), filed by Moishes Moving Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix A to Notice of Removal, #3 Appendix B to Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Consent for Removal, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Defendant)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1212-L-AGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Office of Guy Levy, Inc. v. Moishes Moving Systems et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moishes Moving Systems Of Chicago, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moishes Long Distance Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moishes Mini-Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maya Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moishes Self Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Moving & Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Angert
Represented By: John Andrew Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moishes Moving Systems, LLC
Represented By: Gregg S. Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moishes Moving Systems
Represented By: Gregg S. Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Office of Guy Levy, Inc.
Represented By: John Owen Clune, Jr
Represented By: John Owen Clune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?