Continental Casualty Company v. Phillips Cattle Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: Phillips Cattle Co., Inc., Cleancor LNG, LLC doing business as Cleancor Energy Solutions, Genox Transportation, Inc., Jason Laird, Laird Transportation, LLC and Does 1-30
Case Number: 3:2021cv01244
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
3 Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pd
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint : Responses due by 9/8/2021, Replies due by 9/22/2021. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/18/21.(dlg)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael F. Long in support of Continental Casualty Company' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Long, Michael)(zda).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. This case is reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned to this case. Create association to 3:20-cv-02540-GPC-RBM. The new case number is 21-cv-1244-GPC-RBM. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/6/2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/3/2021. (tcf)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:20-cv-02540-JLS-RBM. The new case number is 21CV1244-JLS(RBM).. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/12/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/22/2021.(jpp)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Brian S. Letofsky on behalf of Continental Casualty Company (Letofsky, Brian)Attorney Brian S. Letofsky added to party Continental Casualty Company(pty:pla) (jrm).
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance of Counsel by Krsto Mijanovic on behalf of Genox Transportation, Inc. (Mijanovic, Krsto)Attorney Krsto Mijanovic added to party Genox Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm).
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Genox Transportation, Inc.. (ekb) (jms).
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Genox Transportation, Inc. of case(s) 3:20-cv-2540-JLS-RBM. (ekb) (jms).
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15906941.), filed by Genox Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Steven A. Scordalakis, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Motion to Amend State Court Complaint, #5 State Court Exhibit, #6 Demand for Jury Trial)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1244-AJB-MDD. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(ekb) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Company v. Phillips Cattle Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael Francis Long
Represented By: Brian S. Letofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Cattle Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleancor LNG, LLC doing business as Cleancor Energy Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genox Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Scordalakis
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laird Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?