Santillan v. Verizon Connect Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Hiram Santillan
Defendant: Verizon Connect Inc. and Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 3:2021cv01257
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 1/23/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/7/2021.(jmr)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 8/30/2021. The case did not settle. A Case Management Conference was also held on 8/30/2021. Scheduling order to issue.(no document attached) (plh)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and the Case Management Conference have been re-scheduled for 8/30/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. To prepare for and attend these conferences, the parties shall refer to the Court's prior Notice and Order. [Doc. No. 8.](no document attached) (plh)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Antonio Hiram Santillan (Lander, Gregg)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (1) Recusing from Case and (2) Requesting Reassignment. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. This case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21-cv-1257-H-KSC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/28/2021. (tcf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Cynthia Bashant is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 21-cv-1257-JLS-KSC.(no document attached) (ekb)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance;and Case Management Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/16/21.(jmo)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance Nancy Nguyen by Nancy M. N. Nguyen on behalf of Verizon Connect Inc. (Nguyen, Nancy)Attorney Nancy M. N. Nguyen added to party Verizon Connect Inc.(pty:dft) (jmo).
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of COMPLIANCE by Verizon Connect Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gonell, Carrie) (jmo).
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Connect Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon Connect Inc. (smd) (sjt).
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Verizon Connect Inc. (smd) (sjt).
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Verizon Connect Inc.. Identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon Connect Inc. (smd)(sjt).
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Verizon Connect Inc. (smd) (sjt).
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15917378.), filed by Verizon Connect Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1257-BAS-KSC. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santillan v. Verizon Connect Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Hiram Santillan
Represented By: Kevin T Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Connect Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Anne Gonell
Represented By: Nancy M. N. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?