Bobbs v. National Claims Adjusters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Bobbs
Defendant: National Claims Adjusters, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01323
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Todd W Robinson
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 fl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Approving #6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint September 24, 2021. National Claims Adjusters, Inc. answer due 9/24/2021. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 9/17/21. (sxa)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by National Claims Adjusters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Egley, John)Attorney John Thomas Egley added to party National Claims Adjusters, Inc.(pty:dft)(sxa).
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Bobbs. National Claims Adjusters, Inc. served. (Arbuckle, Melinda)(sxa).
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 PRO HAC APPROVED: Ricardo Jose Prieto appearing for Plaintiff Patricia Bobbs (no document attached) (rmc)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15976464.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Prieto, Ricardo) (rmc).
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (rmc).
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against National Claims Adjusters, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15954908.), filed by Patricia Bobbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Bobbs Consent)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1323-TWR-BGS. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Arbuckle, Melinda) (fth) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobbs v. National Claims Adjusters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bobbs
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: Ricardo Jose Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Claims Adjusters, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Egley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?