Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC et al v. Autel US Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC and Snap-On Incorporated
Defendant: Autel US Inc. and Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01339
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re: #32 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/21/2021. (sjt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 32 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Autel's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Certain Discovery, or in the Alternative, to Stay Certain Discovery Pending Resolution of Autel's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Autel US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Marchese, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Marchese, Christopher) (sjt).
September 17, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Autel US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Barkan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Marchese, Christopher) (anh).
September 17, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Barkan, David) (anh).
September 17, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Autel US Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Corporate Parent Autel (USA) Inc. for Autel US Inc.. (Barkan, David) (anh).
September 17, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Autel US Inc..(Barkan, David) (anh).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Entry of Stipulated Forensic Inspection Protocol as Modified [ECF No. #26 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/17/2021. (anh)
September 7, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION Regarding Stipulated Forensic Protocol re #19 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Forensic Inspection Protocol)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Entry of Stipulated Protective Order as Modified [ECF No. #21 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/19/2021. (anh) (Main Document 25 replaced on 8/19/2021) (anh).
August 11, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanel Nicole Sunga on behalf of Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Autel US Inc. (Sunga, Jeanel)Attorney Jeanel Nicole Sunga added to party Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeanel Nicole Sunga added to party Autel US Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
August 11, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Rawson on behalf of Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Autel US Inc. (Rawson, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Rawson added to party Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Rawson added to party Autel US Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
August 10, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Marchese on behalf of Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Autel US Inc. (Marchese, Christopher)Attorney Christopher Scott Marchese added to party Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Scott Marchese added to party Autel US Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Motion for (1) Leve to Take Expedited Discovery and (2) Evidence Preservation Order by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated re #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Pending Motions [Doc. Nos. #6 , #18 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/9/2021. (anh)
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION and Stipulation Regarding Pending Motions re #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereto, #7 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery and for Evidence Preservation Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd., Autel US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed Order))(Barkan, David)Attorney David M. Barkan added to party Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Barkan added to party Autel US Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #16 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, --Declaration of Janet S. Kim Certifying Plaintiffs' Compliance With the Court's August 3, 2021 Order by Plaintiffs Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Kim, Janet) (anh).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule AS to: (1) Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery and Evidence Preservation Order [ECF No. #7 ]; and (2) Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order [ECF No. #8 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/3/2021.(anh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Berkeley G. Fife on behalf of Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated (Fife, Berkeley)Attorney Berkeley G. Fife added to party Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Berkeley G. Fife added to party Snap-On Incorporated(pty:pla) (anh).
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #10 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, - Declaration of Janet S. Kim Certifying Plaintiffs' Compliance with the Court's July 29, 2021 Order by Plaintiffs Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Kim, Janet) (anh).
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet S Kim on behalf of Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated (Kim, Janet)Attorney Janet S Kim added to party Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janet S Kim added to party Snap-On Incorporated(pty:pla) (anh).
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Lanham on behalf of Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated (Lanham, John)Attorney John R. Lanham added to party Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John R. Lanham added to party Snap-On Incorporated(pty:pla) (anh).
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (sxa).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 8/6/2021 and Replies due by 8/13/2021. A Motion Hearing is set for 8/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Plaintiffs shall promptly provide a copy of this order (along with their motion papers, if they have not done so already) to Plaintiffs in the same manner and using the same means as they delivered the 7/27/2021, letter referenced in the Declaration of Janet S. Kim [Doc. No. #6 -3]. Plaintiffs shall file a declaration with the Court when they have complied with this requirement. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/29/2021.(ag)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC's and Snap-On Incorporated's #5 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/29/2021. (ag)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Table of Exhibits to Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Motion, #4 Declaration of Bradley Lewis, #5 Declaration of Janet S. Kim, #6 Table of Exhibits to Kim Decl., #7 Exhibit 1 to Kim Decl.)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery and for Evidence Preservation Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janet S. Kim, #2 Table of Exhibits to Kim Decl., #3 Exhibit 1 to Kim Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Kim Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Kim Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Kim Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 to Kim Decl.)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereto by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Grier (redacted version), #2 Declaration of Daniel Roffman (redacted version), #3 Declaration of Janet S. Kim, #4 Table of Exhibits to Kim Decl., #5 Exhibit 1 to Kim Decl., #6 Declaration of Bradley Lewis, #7 Table of Exhibits to Lewis Decl., #8 Exhibit 1 to Lewis Decl., #9 Exhibit 2 to Lewis Decl., #10 Exhibit 3 to Lewis Decl., #11 Exhibit 4 to Lewis Decl., #12 Exhibit 5 to Lewis Decl., #13 Exhibit 6 to Lewis Decl., #14 Exhibit 7 to Lewis Decl., #15 Exhibit 8 to Lewis Decl. (redacted), #16 Exhibit 9 to Lewis Decl., #17 Exhibit 10 to Lewis Decl. (redacted), #18 Exhibit 11 to Lewis Decl. (redacted), #19 Exhibit 12 to Lewis Decl. (redacted), #20 Exhibit 13 to Lewis Decl., #21 Exhibit 14 to Lewis Decl. (redacted), #22 Exhibit 15 to Lewis Decl., #23 Exhibit 16 to Lewis Decl.)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) QC Email: Sealed Proposed Lodged documents not submitted(anh).
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Snap-On Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Snap-On Incorporated.. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Genuine Parts Company, Other Affiliate Snap-On Incorporated for Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC.. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (anh).
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (rmc).
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Autel US Inc., Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., LTD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15967028.), filed by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC, Snap-On Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1339-CAB-BGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (fth) Filer contacted about missing TRO papers (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC et al v. Autel US Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth A. Kuwayti
Represented By: Berkeley G. Fife
Represented By: Janet S Kim
Represented By: John R. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snap-On Incorporated
Represented By: Kenneth A. Kuwayti
Represented By: Berkeley G. Fife
Represented By: Janet S Kim
Represented By: John R. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autel US Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott Marchese
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Represented By: Jeanel Nicole Sunga
Represented By: Timothy Rawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autel Intelligent Technology Corp., Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Scott Marchese
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Represented By: Jeanel Nicole Sunga
Represented By: Timothy Rawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?