Parker v. United States Probation Office et al
Plaintiff: Derek Richard Parker
Defendant: United States Probation Office, Mimi Manzano, Christopher J. Marco, Ymelda Valenzuela and John Does #1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01373
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 fi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Re: Oral Argument. The October 1, 2021 motion hearing is vacated. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/27/2021.(zda)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mimi Manzano, Christopher J. Marco, United States Probation Office, Ymelda Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Parker, Katherine)(zda).
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #3 ; or Alternatively, Request for Leave to Amend by Derek Richard Parker. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/13/2021. (zda)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; or Alternatively, Request for Leave to Amend, from Plaintiff Derek Richard Parker. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/13/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/16/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mimi Manzano, Christopher J. Marco, United States Probation Office, Ymelda Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Mimi Manzano(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Christopher J. Marco(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party United States Probation Office(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Ymelda Valenzuela(pty:dft) (zda).
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (dxf)(jrd)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against United States Probation Office, Mimi Manzano, Christopher J. Marco, Ymelda Valenzuela, John Does #1-10, (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number CAS131495.), filed by Derek Richard Parker. (Attachments: #1 Typed Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1373-DMS-DEB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. United States Probation Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Richard Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Probation Office
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimi Manzano
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Marco
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ymelda Valenzuela
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?