Morton et al v. County of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Morton and Dean Morton
Defendant: County of San Diego, Samantha Macanlalay, Bijan Rahmani, Hosanna Alto, Matthew Berlin, Liberty Healthcare and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01428
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute Order Denying Motion as Moot: Pending before the Court is Defendants Hosanna Alto, County of San Diego, and Samantha Macanlalay's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. On October 4, 2021, Plaintiffs filed an Amended Complaint. See Doc. No. 8. Accordingly, the Complaint that Defendants seek to dismiss is no longer the operative pleading in this action, as the Amended Complaint supersedes the original complaint. Therefore, the Court DENIES AS MOOT Defendants' #6 MOTION to dismiss and VACATES the corresponding October 18, 2021 hearing. All Defendants must respond to the First Amended Complaint within the time prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on October 5, 2021.(mac)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Dean Morton, Marilyn Morton. (Pena, Danielle) (jms).
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Matthew Berlin, Liberty Healthcare, Bijan Rahmani.(Kiefer, Mark)Attorney Mark L Kiefer added to party Matthew Berlin(pty:dft), Attorney Mark L Kiefer added to party Liberty Healthcare(pty:dft), Attorney Mark L Kiefer added to party Bijan Rahmani(pty:dft) (tcf).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Hosanna Alto, County of San Diego, Samantha Macanlalay. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Vilaseca, Christina) (tcf).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Consolidate County Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline. Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the parties' motion and ORDERS that County Defendants answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 9/20/2021. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/1/2021. (tcf)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Continue and Consolidate the County Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by Hosanna Alto, County of San Diego, Samantha Macanlalay. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vilaseca, Christina)Attorney Christina Isabel Vilaseca added to party Hosanna Alto(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Isabel Vilaseca added to party County of San Diego(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Isabel Vilaseca added to party Samantha Macanlalay(pty:dft) (tcf).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Michael M. Anello for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv01428-MMA-KSC.(no document attached) (dxf)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)(jrd)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hosanna Alto, Matthew Berlin, County of San Diego, Does 1-10, Liberty Healthcare, Samantha Macanlalay, Bijan Rahmani, filed by Dean Morton, Marilyn Morton. (Filing fee $402 - receipt number ACASDC-16013239) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1428-DMS-KSC. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Pena, Danielle) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morton et al v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Morton
Represented By: Danielle Renee Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Morton
Represented By: Danielle Renee Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: Christina Isabel Vilaseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Macanlalay
Represented By: Christina Isabel Vilaseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bijan Rahmani
Represented By: Mark L Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosanna Alto
Represented By: Christina Isabel Vilaseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Berlin
Represented By: Mark L Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Healthcare
Represented By: Mark L Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?