Renteria v. Cuevas et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Dave Renteria
Defendant: Cuevas, Byrnes, Kako, Meeks, ., M. Garcia, Rico, Ms. T. Martinez and Marcus Pollard
Case Number: 3:2021cv01507
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Fee for Civil Case Opening: $402.00 Paid on 10/22/2021. (jms) (jms).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Ronald Dave Renteria. A review of the USCA's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the USDC the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in the USCA proof of such payment or file in the USCA a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. The Clerk shall serve a Form 4 financial affidavit on appellant. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal may be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. (akr)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 USCA Time Schedule Order as to #5 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Ronald Dave Renteria. (akr)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 USCA Case Number 21-56121 for #5 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Ronald Dave Renteria. (akr)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit by Ronald Dave Renteria as to #4 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Fee not paid. (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff does not pay the full $402 filing fee in one lump sum on or before November 15, 2021, this case will remain dismissed without prejudice based on his failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) and without any further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/17/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement from Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility - Trust Office. (jms)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Dave Renteria. (jms)(jrd)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Cuevas, Byrnes, Kako, Meeks, M. Garcia, Rico, Ms. T. Martinez, Marcus Pollard, filed by Ronald Dave Renteria. ($402.00 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CDCR Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1507-JLS-MSB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renteria v. Cuevas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dave Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meeks, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. T. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?