Joaquin v. National Seating & Mobility, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corissa Joaquin
Defendant: National Seating & Mobility, Inc. and Pride Mobility Products Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv01580
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by National Seating & Mobility, Inc..(Ready, Marty) (jpp).
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by National Seating & Mobility, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Ready, Marty) (jpp).
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corissa Joaquin. Pride Mobility Products Corporation served. (Harlan, Jordon) (jpp).
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Corissa Joaquin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corissa Joaquin, #2 Exhibit Death Certificate)New Summons Requested. (Harlan, Jordon) (fth).
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kammann S. Cole on behalf of National Seating & Mobility, Inc. (Cole, Kammann)Attorney Kammann S. Cole added to party National Seating & Mobility, Inc.(pty:dft) (zda).
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to on or before 11/4/2021. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/01/2021. (jpp)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by National Seating & Mobility, Inc.. (Ready, Marty)Attorney Marty B. Ready added to party National Seating & Mobility, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corissa Joaquin. National Seating & Mobility, Inc. served. (Harlan, Jordon) (jpp).
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against National Seating & Mobility, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16112507.), filed by Corissa Joaquin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1580-BEN-JLB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Harlan, Jordon) (fth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joaquin v. National Seating & Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corissa Joaquin
Represented By: Jordon R. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Seating & Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Marty B. Ready
Represented By: Kammann S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride Mobility Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?