Estate of Oral W. Nunis, Sr. et al v. City of Chula Vista et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Oral W. Nunis, Sr., Roxie A. Nunis, Naomi Nunis and Willie Mae Kirkland
Defendant: City of Chula Vista and Does 1 through 40
Case Number: 3:2021cv01627
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 ra
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Estate of Oral W. Nunis, Sr., Willie Mae Kirkland, Naomi Nunis, Roxie A. Nunis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carl E. Douglas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proof of Service)(Douglas, Carl)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Motion for Approval of Substitution of Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/10/2021. (jrm)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel for Defendants by City of Chula Vista. (Sain, Anthony) (jrm).
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Chula Vista. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Tori Bakken)(Bakken, Tori) (jmo).
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Estate of Oral W. Nunis, Sr., Willie Mae Kirkland, Naomi Nunis, Roxie A. Nunis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron A. Stewart, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Douglas, Carl) (jrm).
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Tori Bakken on behalf of City of Chula Vista (Bakken, Tori)Attorney Tori Bakken added to party City of Chula Vista(pty:dft) (jrm).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Responses due by 11/5/2021; Replies due by 11/12/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Estate of Oral W. Nunis, Sr., Willie Mae Kirkland, Naomi Nunis, Roxie A. Nunis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Carl E. Douglas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Douglas, Carl) (jrm).
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT [28 U.S.C. 1446(d)] by City of Chula Vista re #1 Notice of Removal, (Sain, Anthony) (jrm).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #5 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment, #3 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment, #4 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment,,, from Defendant City of Chula Vista. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(a), (g) - Docket entry does not accurately reflect the document(s) file; OTHER: Supplemental documents require court order; Improper title; Missing name, address, telephone.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (Attachments: #1 Stricken Document 3, #2 Stricken Document 4, #3 Stricken Document 5)(jrm)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 ***Document withdrawn per Order #6 *** NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by City of Chula Vista re #1 Notice of Removal, Exs 31-38 (Attachments: # 1 Answer to First Amend Complaint, # 2 Kimone Nunis Complaint, # 3 Kimone Nunis Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Ntc to Appear Lacy, # 5 Kimone Nunis Summons, # 6 Notice Related Case, # 7 Kimone Nunis Answer to Complaint)(Sain, Anthony) (jrm). Modified to strike on 9/20/2021 (jrm). (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/20/2021) (jrm).
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 ***Document stricken per Order #6 *** NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by City of Chula Vista re #1 Notice of Removal, Exs 16-30 (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Strike, # 2 Sain Declaration, # 3 Amend to Complaint Doe 1, # 4 Amend to Complaint Doe 2, # 5 Amend to Complaint Doe 3, # 6 Amend to Complaint Doe 4, # 7 Amend to Complaint Doe 5, # 8 Amend to Complaint Doe 6, # 9 Amend to Complaint Doe 7, # 10 Amend to Complaint Doe 8, # 11 Opp to Mtn to Strike, # 12 Reply re Mtn to Strike, # 13 Ntc of Ruling Mtn to Strike, # 14 Ntc Related Case)(Sain, Anthony) (jrm). Modified to strike on 9/20/2021 (jrm). (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/20/2021) (jrm).
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 ***Document Stricken per Order #6 *** NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by City of Chula Vista re #1 Notice of Removal, Exs. 2-15 (Attachments: # 1 Appl for GAL, # 2 Appl for GAL, # 3 Roxie Nunis Declaration, # 4 Demurrer, # 5 Motion to Strike, # 6 Sain Declaration, # 7 Stip for Protective Order, # 8 Opp to Motion to Strike, # 9 Non-Opp to Demurrer, # 10 Deft's CMC Statement, # 11 Reply re Motion to Strike, # 12 First Amend Complaint)(Sain, Anthony) (jrm). Modified to strike on 9/20/2021 (jrm). (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/20/2021) (jrm).
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by City of Chula Vista. Identifying Other Affiliate Kimone Nunis, Other Affiliate Oral W. Nunis, Other Affiliate Andre Nunis, Other Affiliate Ludecea Nunis, Other Affiliate Evan Linney, Other Affiliate Manuel Padilla, Other Affiliate David Rivers, Other Affiliate Brian Olson, Other Affiliate Jordan Salvador, Other Affiliate David Arce, Other Affiliate Denny Kremer, for City of Chula Vista. (fth)(rmc).
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16137326.), filed by City of Chula Vista. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Summons)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1627-AJB-DEB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (fth) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Oral W. Nunis, Sr. et al v. City of Chula Vista et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Oral W. Nunis, Sr.
Represented By: Carl E. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxie A. Nunis
Represented By: Carl E. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Nunis
Represented By: Carl E. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Kirkland
Represented By: Carl E. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chula Vista
Represented By: Anthony M. Sain
Represented By: Tori Bakken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?